EP2160084 - Contact device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Detterbeck, Manfred Kornburger Straße 9 90530 Wendelstein / DE | 02 /
Waedt, Günter Poststraße 13c 91301 Forchheim / DE | 03 /
Drews, Michael Otto-Hahn-Str. 99 40591 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
Fellechner, Lotar Am Hang 4 85253 Erdweg / DE | 05 /
Gebhard, Bruno John-F.-Kennedy-Ring 11 A 91301 Forchheim / DE | 06 /
Kitzmüller, Andreas Heinrich-Casper-G. 20 8010 Graz / AT | 07 /
Polley, Rüdiger Leipziger Straße 20a 91058 Erlangen / DE | 08 /
Summerer, Josef Humboldtgasse 23/7 1100 Wien / AT | 09 /
Zebunke, Stefan Keltenring 11 96199 Zapfendorf / DE | [2010/09] | Application number, filing date | 09168450.6 | 24.08.2009 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | DE20081045649 | 02.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008045649 | [2010/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2160084 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/04, H05K9/00, H05K5/06 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
H05K5/061 (EP);
H05K9/0009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kontaktanordnung | [2010/09] | English: | Contact device | [2010/09] | French: | Dispositif de contact | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 20.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 31.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0715492 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [XI]DE10351710 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [I] 4; | [X]EP1569505 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [I]JP2003031964 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [I] 1,5-6 * the whole document *; | [I]US6401930 (BOYER THOMAS [US], et al) [I] 1,5-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0715492 | DE10351710 | EP1569505 | JP2003031964 | US6401930 |