EP2158821 - Bristle-dividing element for an apparatus for making brushes or brooms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borghi S.P.A. Via Cristoforo Colombo 12 41013 Castelfranco Emilia (MO) / IT | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pini, Vittorio Via Modenese 2784 41057 Spilamberto (MO) / IT | [2012/24] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
Pini, Vittorio Via Modenese 2784 41057, Spilamberto (MO) / IT | Representative(s) | Crugnola, Pietro, et al Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Crugnola, Pietro, et al Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 09168757.4 | 26.08.2009 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | IT2008MO00223 | 01.09.2008 Original published format: IT MO20080223 | [2010/09] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2158821 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2158821 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A46D3/04 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
A46D3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | Borstenteilungselement für eine Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Bürsten oder Besen | [2010/09] | English: | Bristle-dividing element for an apparatus for making brushes or brooms | [2010/09] | French: | Élément de division de poils pour appareil servant à fabriquer des brosses et des balais | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 16.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2009 | AT | 24.10.2012 | BE | 24.10.2012 | CY | 24.10.2012 | CZ | 24.10.2012 | DK | 24.10.2012 | EE | 24.10.2012 | FI | 24.10.2012 | HR | 24.10.2012 | IT | 24.10.2012 | LT | 24.10.2012 | LV | 24.10.2012 | MC | 24.10.2012 | MK | 24.10.2012 | MT | 24.10.2012 | NL | 24.10.2012 | PL | 24.10.2012 | RO | 24.10.2012 | SE | 24.10.2012 | SI | 24.10.2012 | SK | 24.10.2012 | SM | 24.10.2012 | TR | 24.10.2012 | BG | 24.01.2013 | NO | 24.01.2013 | GR | 25.01.2013 | ES | 04.02.2013 | IS | 24.02.2013 | PT | 25.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
MK | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 24.10.2012 | |
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | NO | 24.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1493355 (BOUCHERIE NV G B [BE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0304110 (BOUCHERIE NV G B [BE]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 42; figure -; claim - * |