EP2166370 - Method and apparatus for sharing information between GPS engines in mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Yong-Sik No 702-1204 Ggotme Maeul Geumgang APT Jukjeon-dong 1300 Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Birchenough, Lewis, et al HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Birchenough, Lewis, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/35] | Harrison Goddard Foote Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/12] | Boakes, Jason Carrington Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York, Yorkshire YO1 6JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 09168780.6 | 27.08.2009 | [2010/12] | Priority number, date | KR20080090985 | 17.09.2008 Original published format: KR 20080090985 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2166370 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/00 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
G01S19/05 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/25 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/27 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur gemeinsamen Nutzung von Informationen zwischen GPS-Vorrichtungen in einem mobilen Endgerät | [2010/12] | English: | Method and apparatus for sharing information between GPS engines in mobile terminal | [2010/12] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le partage d'informations dans un terminal mobile entre moteurs de GPS dans un terminal mobile | [2010/12] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 10.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.06.2015 | 30.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/38] | 10.05.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/38] | 29.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007290920 (SHINTAI TATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,2A,2B * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0036] *; | [X]US2007132636 (YOUNG JASON T [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0010]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * |