Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7540457 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2009 | B2 | US2006266909 | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14134805 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7389965 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2008 | B2 | US2006266903 | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14142505 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008542654 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US14134805 | 31.05.2005 | WO2006US18329 | 11.05.2006 | US14142505 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1886061 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2011 | B1 | EP1886061 | 13.02.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US14134805 | 31.05.2005 | WO2006US18329 | 11.05.2006 | US14142505 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006252871 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14134805 | 31.05.2005 | WO2006US18329 | 11.05.2006 | US14142505 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2119950 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2009 | A3 | EP2119950 | 18.11.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US14134805 | 31.05.2005 | EP06759618 | 11.05.2006 | US14142505 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE515663T | 15.07.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US14134805 | 31.05.2005 | WO2006US18329 | 11.05.2006 | US14142505 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2609289 | 22.01.2013 | C | CA2609289 | 07.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14134805 | 31.05.2005 | WO2006US18329 | 11.05.2006 | US14142505 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101184951B | 01.12.2010 | B | CN101184951 | 21.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US14134805 | 31.05.2005 | WO2006US18329 | 11.05.2006 | US14142505 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1886061T | 26.09.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14134805 | 31.05.2005 | WO2006US18329 | 11.05.2006 | US14142505 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006130324 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2007 | A3 | WO2006130324 | 07.12.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US14134805 | 31.05.2005 | US14142505 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101982694 | 02.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US14134805 | 31.05.2005 | US14142505 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Earlier application | EP1886061 |