EP2119950 - Angled mini arm having a clevis assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovative Office Products, Inc. 100 Kuebler Road Easton, PA 18040 / US | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oddsen, Jr., Odd N. 1120 Morgan Hill Road Easton, PA 18042 / US | 02 /
Derry, Bradley A. 319 W. Lafayette Street Easton, PA 18042 / US | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstraße 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Siebensterngasse 54 1071 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2009/47] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09168835.8 | 11.05.2006 | [2009/47] | Priority number, date | US20050141348 | 31.05.2005 Original published format: US 141348 | US20050141425 | 31.05.2005 Original published format: US 141425 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2119950 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2119950 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/04 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
F16M11/10 (EP);
F16M11/2014 (EP);
F16M11/2092 (EP);
F16M11/24 (EP);
F16M13/022 (EP);
F16M2200/063 (EP);
F16M2200/065 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | Winkelförmiger Minihebel mit einer Gabelkopfanordnung | [2009/47] | English: | Angled mini arm having a clevis assembly | [2009/47] | French: | Mini bras incliné doté d'un ensemble de chape | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 15.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/18] | 07.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06759618.9 / EP1886061 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060759618) is 11.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9213749 (ALLSOP INC [US]) [A] 9-12 * figures 14-17 * * page 21, line 14 - page 23, line 22 *; | [Y]US5975472 (HUNG CHIN-JUI [TW]) [Y] 6 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 37 - line 67 *; | [XY]US6012693 (VOELLER DONALD M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,13,14,16,17 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 33 * [Y] 6-8; | [X]DE20018361U (HUNG RAY [TW]) [X] 13-17 * figures 1-4 * * page 5, line 8 - page 8, line 30 *; | [DY]US6409134 (ODDSEN JR ODD N [US]) [DY] 7,8 * figures 8-10 * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 58 * * column 7, line 12 - line 32 * * figures 11c,11d *; | [X]US6592090 (LI CHIN-CHU [TW]) [X] 1-4,6,8 * figures 3-6 * * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 35 *; | [A]US2004222344 (ODDSEN ODD N [US]) [A] * figure 18 ** paragraph [0088] *; | [PX]GB2416062 (HUNG RAY [TW]) [PX] 1-6,13,14,16,17 * figures 3,4 * * page 4 - page 5 * * claim 1 * | by applicant | US6409134 | US6478274 | US6505988 | US20030461637 | US20050058820 | US20050141348 | US20050141425 |