EP2186577 - Tank cleaning method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kappel, Werner Robert-Koch-Str. 3 76829 Landau / DE | For all designated states Rantschigei, Franz Josef Bachfeld 10 68623 Lampertheim / DE | [2012/39] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/39] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
Kappel, Werner Robert-Koch-Strasse 3 76829 Landau / DE | ||
02 /
Rantschigei, Franz Josef Bachfeld 10 68623 Lampertheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09169105.5 | 01.09.2009 | [2010/20] | Priority number, date | DE20081041733 | 01.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008041733 | [2010/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2186577 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/00, B08B9/08 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
B08B9/08 (EP);
B08B3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Tankreinigung | [2010/20] | English: | Tank cleaning method | [2010/20] | French: | Procédé de nettoyage de réservoir | [2010/20] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 24.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2004238006 (SEARS SEAN E [US], et al) [Y] 9 * claim 1 * [A] 1-8,10-15; | [A]US3549421 (MCFADDEN THOMAS P, et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,2,4 *; | [A]JPH01179682 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1-8,10-15 * abstract *; | [YA]JPS56115690 (CHUBU KARIYOKU KOUJI KK) [Y] 9 * abstract * [A] 1-8,10-15; | [YA]JPH05253553 (SUMITOMO CONSTR. MACH CO LTD) [Y] 9 * abstract * [A] 1-8,10-15 | by applicant | US3549421 | JPH05253553 | US2004238006 | JPH01179682 | JPS56115690 |