EP2290123 - Processes for producing thin metal nitride layers, inter alia making use of a selective decomposition of alcoholates, processes for hardening a surface, for obtaining thin oxygen compound layers, articles comprising said layers and uses thereof, and a process for obtaining metal hydrides and aldehydes/ketones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität des Saarlandes Wissens- und Technologietransfer GmbH Im Stadtwald Gebäude A1.1 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. rer. nat. Sachdev, Hermann Waldhausweg 9 66123, Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
Dr. rer. nat. Müller, Frank Pfaffenkopfstrasse 95 66125, Saarbrücken / DE | 03 /
Prof.Dr.Dr.h.c.mult. Hüfner, Stefan Königsberger Strasse 19 66121, Saarbrücken / DE | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Neidlein, Helga, et al Gille Hrabal Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Neidlein, Helga, et al Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patent Attorneys Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09169114.7 | 01.09.2009 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2290123 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/30, C23C16/34, C23C16/56, C30B33/00, C30B33/12, C30B25/02, C30B25/18 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
C23C16/56 (EP);
B82Y10/00 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
B82Y40/00 (EP);
C23C16/303 (EP);
C23C16/342 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von dünnen Metall-Nitrid-Schichten, unter anderem unter Verwendung einer selektiven Zersetzung von Alkoholaten, Verfahren zum Härten einer Oberfläche, zum Erhalten von dünnen Sauerstoffverbindungsschichten und Verwendungen davon, sowie ein Verfahren zum Erhalten von Metallhydriden und Aldehyden/Ketonen | [2011/09] | English: | Processes for producing thin metal nitride layers, inter alia making use of a selective decomposition of alcoholates, processes for hardening a surface, for obtaining thin oxygen compound layers, articles comprising said layers and uses thereof, and a process for obtaining metal hydrides and aldehydes/ketones | [2011/09] | French: | Procédés pour la production de minces couches de nitrure métallique, utilisant entre autres la décomposition sélective d'alcoolates, procédés de durcissement d'une surface pour l'obtention de couches composées, articles comprenant lesdites couches et leurs utilisations, et procédé pour l'obtention d'hydrures métalliques et d'aldéhydes/cétones | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2319533 (TRIKON EQUIP LTD [GB]) [X] 1,6-7,9-10 * page 10, line 3 - line 8; figure 1 * * page 1, line 4 * * page 12, line 3 * * page 13, line 25 * * page 4, line 6 - line 8 *; | [XDA] - MULLER F ET AL, "Epitaxial growth of boron nitride on a Rh(111) multilayer system: Formation and fine tuning of a BN-nanomesh", SURFACE SCIENCE, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 603, no. 3, ISSN 0039-6028, (20090201), pages 425 - 432, (20081105), XP025923833 [XD] 9-12 * the whole document * [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.susc.2008.10.033 | by applicant | - M. ENGLER ET AL., CFI/BER. DKG 84, (2007), vol. 12, pages E49 - E53 | - R. LASKOWSKI ET AL., PHYS. REV. LETT., (2007), vol. 98, page 106802 | - R. LASKOWSKI ET AL., J. PHYS. CONDENS. MATTER, (2008), vol. 20, page 064207 | - M. CORSO ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 303, page 217 | - S: BERNER ET AL., ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, (2007), vol. 46, page 5115 | - H. DIL ET AL., SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 319, page 1826 | - S. BERNER ET AL., ANGEW. CHEMIE, (2007), vol. 46, page 5115 | - NATURE NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 2, page 459 | - A. GORIACHKO ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. C, (2008), vol. 112, pages 10432 - 10427 | - H. SACHDEV ET AL., DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, (1999), vol. 8, page 319 | - B. LUX ET AL., SUPER CARBON, (1998), vol. 127 | - ZHANG ET AL., NATURE MATERIALS, (2003), vol. 2, page 1539 | - J. YU ET AL., DIAMOND RELATED MATERIALS, (2003), vol. 12, page 1539 | - P.B. MIRKARIMI ET AL., J. MATER. RES., (1994), vol. 9, page 2925 | - R.C: DE VRIES ET AL., J. CRYST. GROWTH, (1972), vol. 13-14, page 88 | - O. MISHIMA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 238, page 181 | - O. FUKUNAGA ET AL., DIAMOND RELAT. MATER., (2004), vol. 13, page 1709 | - T. TANIGUCHI ET AL., JPN. J. APPL. PHYS., (2002), vol. 41, pages L 1 09 - L 111 | - Y. KUBOTA ET AL., SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 317, pages 932 - 934 | - H. SACHDEV ET AL., DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, (2000), vol. 9, pages 614 - 619 | - H. SACHDEV, DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, (2000), vol. 10, pages 1390 - 1397 | - NAGASHIMA ET AL., SURF. SCI., (1996), vol. 307, pages 357 - 358 | - F. MüLLER ET AL., SURF. SCI., (2002), vol. 520, page 158 | - F. MüLLER ET AL., SURF. SCI., (2008), vol. 602, page 3467 | - F. MUTTER ET AL., CHEM. MATER, (2005), vol. 17, page 3464 | - A.B. PREOBRAJENSKI ET AL., PHYS. REV. B, (2007), vol. 75, page 245412 | - M. MORSCHER ET AL., SURF. SCI., (2006), vol. 600, page 3280 | - W. AUWARTER, SURF. SCI., (1999), vol. 429, page 229 | - W. AUWARTER ET AL., CHEM. MATER., (2004), vol. 16, page 343 | - W. AUWARTER ET AL., SURF. SCI., (2003), vol. 545, page L735 | - J. OSTERWALDER ET AL., SURF. SCI. NANOTECH., (2003), vol. 1, page 124 | - M. MUNTWILER ET AL., PHYS. REV. B, (2007), vol. 75, page 075407 | - T. GREBER ET AL., PROCEEDINGS ALC05, E-J. SURF. SCI. NANOTECH., (2006), vol. 4, page 410 | - M.T. PAFFETT ET AL., SURF. SCI., (1990), vol. 232, page 286 | - M. CORSO ET AL., SURF. SCI., (2005), vol. 577, page L78 | - A. GORIACHKO ET AL., LANGMUIR (LETTERS), (2007), vol. 23, page 2928 | - M.P. ALLAN, NANOSCALE RES. LETT., (2007), vol. 2, page 94 | - O.R. LOURIE ET AL., CHEM. MATER., (2000), vol. 12, page 1808 | - K.T. MOON ET AL., JOURNAL OF IND. AND. ENG. CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 3, page 288 | - R. LASKOWSKI ET AL., PHYS. REV. B, (2008), vol. 78, page 045409 | - S. GSELL ET AL., J- CRYSTAL GROWTH, (2009), vol. 311, page 3731 | - F. MULLER ET AL., SURF. SCI., (2009), vol. 603, page 425 | - F. MUTTER ET AL., SURF. SCI., (2009), vol. 603, page 425 | - H.C. HAMAKER ET AL., PHYS. REV. B, (1983), vol. 27, no. 11, page 6713 | - A. GEIM; K. NOVOSELOV, NATURE MATERIALS, (2007), vol. 6, page 183 | - V.L. SOLOZHENKO ET AL., SOLID STATE COMMUN, (1994), vol. 90, page 65 | - F. MüLLER ET AL., SURF. SCI., (2009), vol. 603, page 425 | - F. MOLLER, SURF. SCI., (2009), vol. 603, page 425 | - W. MODDEMAN ET AL., SURFACE AND INTERFACE ANALYSIS, (1989), vol. 14, page 224 | - H.C: HAMAKER ET AL., PHYS. REV. B, (1983), vol. 27, no. 11, page 6713 | - F: HOLLEMANN; E: WIBERG, Lehrbuch der Anorganischen Chemie, (1985), vol. 91, pages 1104 - 1108 | - J. KISS ET AL., APPL. SURF. SCI., (1989), vol. 37, page 95 | - D.N. HENDRICKSON ET AL., INORG. CHEM., (1969), vol. 9, page 612 | - J.A. SCHREIFELS ET AL., J. CATAL., (1980), vol. 65, page 195 | - M. ELANGO ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. A, (2008), vol. 112, page 8107 | - M.P. SEAH ET AL., SURF. INTERFACE ANAL., (1979), vol. 1, page 2 | - F: MOLLER ET AL., SURF. SCI., (2008), vol. 602, pages 3467 - 3476 | - M. ROMAND ET AL., ANALYSIS, (1976), vol. 4, page 308 | - F. MULLER ET AL., SURF. SCI., (2008), vol. 602, pages 3467 - 3476 | - M. CORSO, SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 303, page 217 |