EP2163985 - Methods and systems of a user interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Henry Room 208, Tower Building Beijing Jiaotong University Beijing 100044 / CN | 02 /
Li, Cheng Jun Ya Yuan 2 No. 2027 Chao Yang District Beijing 100000 / CN | 03 /
Plocher, Tom 9040 152nd Street No. Hugo, MN 55038 / US | 04 /
Bedros, Saad J. 378 East Carmel Avenue West St. Paul, MN 55118 / US | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09169159.2 | 01.09.2009 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | US20080204574 | 04.09.2008 Original published format: US 204574 | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2163985 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
G06F8/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Systeme einer Benutzeroberfläche | [2010/11] | English: | Methods and systems of a user interface | [2010/11] | French: | Procédés et système pour interface utilisateur | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/36] | 02.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6078331 (PULLI KARI ANTERO [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0137071 (YCD MULTIMEDIA LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6704018 (MORI KENICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 8 * * column 8, line 18 - column 10, line 35 *; | [A]WO2004109501 (SWISS REINSURANCE CO [CH], et al) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005083328 (UEDA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1,6* the whole document *; | [Y]US2007013694 (GOLD JULIAN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10 * figure 5 * * page 1, paragraph 8 * * page 2, paragraphs 23-25 *; | [Y]US2007165031 (GILBERT STEPHEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, paragraph 15 - page 4 * * page 4, paragraph 41 - page 5 * * page 7, paragraph 53 - page 8, paragraph 57 * * page 9, paragraph 65 - page 14, paragraph 93 * * page 15, paragraph 98 - page 17, paragraph 116 * * page 19, paragraph 123 - page 20, paragraph 126 * * figures 5,7-10,15-20e * | by applicant | US2007013694 | US2007165031 |