EP2161795 - Miniaturised high voltage connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCT electronic GmbH Schatzbogen 33 81829 München / DE | [2010/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flossmann, Friedrich Georg Schlesierstrasse 1 1/2 83646, Bad Tölz / DE | 02 /
Schmid, Andreas Joseph Brunnwartsweg 2b 82031, Grünwald / DE | 03 /
Rappenglitz, Erich Eschleweg 1 86920, Denklingen / DE | 04 /
Fuhrmann, Frank Adalbertstrasse 19/1 80799, München / DE | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Ganahl, Bernhard, et al Huber & Schüssler Patentanwälte Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | Ganahl, Bernhard, et al Huber & Schüssler Patentanwälte Truderinger Strasse 246 D-81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09169236.8 | 02.09.2009 | [2010/10] | Priority number, date | DE20081046235 | 08.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008046235 | [2010/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2161795 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2161795 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/08 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
H01R13/642 (EP);
B60L53/16 (EP);
H01R13/5025 (EP);
H01R13/5202 (EP);
H01R9/031 (EP);
B60L2270/32 (EP);
B60L2270/34 (EP);
H01R13/5216 (EP);
H01R13/6275 (EP);
H01R2107/00 (EP);
H01R2201/26 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Miniaturisierter Hochstromstecker | [2010/10] | English: | Miniaturised high voltage connector | [2010/10] | French: | Prise à courant élevé miniaturisée | [2010/10] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/01] | 14.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2677115 (STEVENS CHARLES H) [I] 1-4,9-15 * column 4, line 16 - line 49; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]DE202005004231U (TECHPOINTE S A [CH]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0015]; figures 1-2; claim 1 *; | [AD]US4911652 (SAVOCA PAUL F [US], et al) [AD] 1 * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 2; figures 3-5b *; | [A]BE444733 (DUNKEL) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraphs 2-3; figures 5-7 *; | [E]DE102009005323 (AREVA NP GMBH [DE]) [E] 5 * paragraph [0039]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3266009 (JENSEN IRVING K, et al) [A] 5 * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]DE1050853 (SIEMENS&KALSKE AG) [A] 5 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE202007001523U (CONINVERS ELEKTROTECHNISCHE BAUELEMENTE GMBH [DE]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *; | [AD]DE1056221 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 5 * figure 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE19605206 | DE19649707 | EP0616735 | DE4446853 | US4911652 | DE1056221 | DE8718055U | DE202005004231U |