EP2131023 - Split-cycle air hybrid engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scuderi Group LLC 1111 Elm Street Suite 4 West Springfield, MA 01089 / US | [2012/32] |
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states Scuderi Group LLC 111 Elm Street, Suite 4 West Springfield, MA 01089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scuderi, Salvatore 108 Sunset Drive Westfield, MA 01085 / US | 02 /
Scuderi, Stephen 1023 Shaker Road Westfield, MA 01085 / US | [2012/32] |
Former [2009/50] | 01 /
Scuderi, Salvatore 108 Sunset Drive Westfield, MA 01085 / US | ||
02 /
Scuderi, Stephen 1023 Shaker Road Westfield, MA 01085 / US | Representative(s) | Harding, Andrew Philip, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Harding, Andrew Philip, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Harding, Andrew Philip, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/33] | Harding, Andrew Philip, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/50] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 09169245.9 | 21.11.2006 | [2009/50] | Priority number, date | US20060326909 | 07.01.2006 Original published format: US 326909 | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2131023 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2131023 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2131023 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02B21/00, F02B29/00, F02B33/22, F02D17/02 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
F02B33/22 (EP,US);
F02B21/00 (EP,KR,US);
F02B29/00 (EP,US);
F02B41/06 (EP);
F02B75/00 (KR);
F02D17/026 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | Lufthybridmotor mit geteiltem Zyklus | [2009/50] | English: | Split-cycle air hybrid engine | [2009/50] | French: | Moteur hybride à air à cycle divisé | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 24.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06838122.7 / EP1969216 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060838122) is 02.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2006 | AT | 08.08.2012 | BE | 08.08.2012 | CY | 08.08.2012 | CZ | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | IE | 08.08.2012 | LT | 08.08.2012 | LV | 08.08.2012 | NL | 08.08.2012 | PL | 08.08.2012 | RO | 08.08.2012 | SE | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | LU | 21.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | IS | 08.12.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | [2015/08] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 21.11.2006 | |
AT | 08.08.2012 | ||
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
LU | 21.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
LU | 21.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2004072448 (D J ENGINEERING INC [US], et al) [I] 1-5,8-15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0043]; figure 1 * [A] 6,7; | [A]WO2004113700 (SCUDERI GROUP LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 45, line 1 - page 47, line 14; figures 1-7,26 *; | [A]DE2423576 (KIENER & BORST OHG) [A] 1-15 * page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1561625 (INT TRUCK INTELLECTUAL PROP CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-3d *; | [A]FR2810373 (GOLIBRODSKI BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1,6 * page 7, column 27 - column 33 * | by applicant | US6543225 | US6609371 | US6952923 | US20060326909 |