EP2159166 - Assembly of a package and plant bulbs arranged therein, and a method for cultivating plant bulbs. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patentstar BV Alfensvaart 7 2771 NM Boskoop / NL | [2012/32] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states Boomkwekerij van der Starre B.V. Alfensvaart 7 2771 NM Boskoop / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Starre, Huibert / Abr. Kroesweg 9/A 2742 KV, Waddinxveen / NL | [2012/13] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
van der Starre, Huibert Abr. Kroesweg 9/A 2742 KV, Waddinxveen / NL | Representative(s) | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2010/09] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09169283.0 | 02.09.2009 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | NL20082001946 | 02.09.2008 Original published format: NL 2001946 | [2010/09] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2159166 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2159166 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/52 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
B65D85/52 (EP,US);
A01G22/35 (EP,US);
A01G9/029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | Zusammenbau einer Verpackung und Pflanzenzwiebeln darin, und Verfahren zum Anbau der Pflanzenzwiebeln | [2010/09] | English: | Assembly of a package and plant bulbs arranged therein, and a method for cultivating plant bulbs. | [2010/09] | French: | Ensemble d'un conditionnement et bulbes de plante agencés dans celui-ci, et procédé de culture de bulbes de plante | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2009 | AT | 28.03.2012 | BE | 28.03.2012 | CY | 28.03.2012 | CZ | 28.03.2012 | DK | 28.03.2012 | EE | 28.03.2012 | FI | 28.03.2012 | HR | 28.03.2012 | IT | 28.03.2012 | LT | 28.03.2012 | LV | 28.03.2012 | MK | 28.03.2012 | MT | 28.03.2012 | PL | 28.03.2012 | RO | 28.03.2012 | SE | 28.03.2012 | SI | 28.03.2012 | SK | 28.03.2012 | SM | 28.03.2012 | TR | 28.03.2012 | BG | 28.06.2012 | NO | 28.06.2012 | GR | 29.06.2012 | ES | 09.07.2012 | IS | 28.07.2012 | PT | 30.07.2012 | IE | 02.09.2012 | LU | 02.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 02.09.2009 | |
AT | 28.03.2012 | ||
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
SM | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 02.09.2012 | ||
LU | 02.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
SM | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 02.09.2012 | ||
LU | 02.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 02.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 02.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 02.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 28.03.2012 | |
NO | 28.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2005150798 (AMMERLAAN ARNOLDUS [NL]) [AD] 1-15* the whole document * | Examination | US2005257425 | by applicant | US2005150798 |