EP2164158 - Method and apparatus to reduce line current harmonics from a power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Power Integrations, Inc. 5245 Hellyer Avenue San Jose, California 95138 / US | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odell, Arthur B. 10360 Menhart Lane Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Conroy, John, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09170158.1 | 14.09.2009 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | US20080210854 | 15.09.2008 Original published format: US 210854 | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2164158 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2164158 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/12, H02M3/156, H02M1/42 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
H02M1/12 (EP,US);
H02M1/4225 (EP,US);
H02M3/156 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/11] | H02M1/12, H02M3/156 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verringerung der Leitungsstromoberschwingung aus einer Stromversorgung | [2010/11] | English: | Method and apparatus to reduce line current harmonics from a power supply | [2010/11] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour réduire les harmoniques de courant de ligne dans une alimentation électrique | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 21.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001339953 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figure 3 *; | [A]US2003222627 (HWANG JEFFREY [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [ 37] - [0041] * * figures 2, 3 *; | [X]US2004113594 (ATHARI FRANK [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] * * figures 3, 4 * |