EP2168937 - Anti-contamination insulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Susumu c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Yoshihiro c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
Sugiura, Yoshiaki c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 04 /
Sato, Ritsu c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09170394.2 | 16.09.2009 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | JP20080250584 | 29.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008250584 | JP20090206919 | 08.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009206919 | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2168937 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2168937 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/81, H01B3/12, H01B17/50 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
H01B17/50 (EP);
C04B41/009 (EP);
C04B41/4961 (EP);
C04B41/52 (EP);
C04B41/84 (EP);
C04B41/87 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B33/26 (EP);
C04B41/4961, C04B41/463, C04B41/5027 (EP);
C04B41/4961, C04B41/463, C04B41/5049 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/463, C04B41/4961, C04B41/5027, C04B41/522 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verschmutzungsbeständiger Isolator | [2010/13] | English: | Anti-contamination insulator | [2010/13] | French: | Isolant anticontamination | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 13.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN201041761Y | [X] - SUZUKI Y ET AL, "A practical study of semiconducting glaze for insulators", ELECTRICAL ENGINEERING IN JAPAN (ENGLISH TRANSLATION OF DENKI GAKKAI RONBUNSHI) 20000415 SCRIPTA TECHNICA INC, (20000415), vol. 131, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1002/(SICI)1520-6416(20000415)131:1<10::AID-EEJ2>3.0.CO;2-E, pages 10 - 18, XP002666704 [X] 1-6 * page 10, column r, paragraph l - page 11, column r, paragraph 2 * * figures 5,9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DOI:10.1002/(SICI)1520-6416(20000415)131:1<10::AID-EEJ2>3.0.CO;2-E | [XA] - WEIYAN LIAO ET AL, "Reducing Ice Accumulation on Insulators by Applying Semiconducting RTV Silicone Coating", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON DIELECTRICS AND ELECTRICAL INSULATION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20071201), vol. 14, no. 6, doi:10.1109/TDEI.2007.4401227, ISSN 1070-9878, pages 1446 - 1454, XP011198815 [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * * page 1447, column r, paragraph 2 * [A] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TDEI.2007.4401227 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 34, Database accession no. 2008-E89574, XP002666705 & CN201041761Y Y 20080326 (UNIV FUZHOU) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * * figure 1 * | by applicant | - "Insulator", INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS OF JAPAN (IEEJ), (198306), page 2 | - "Insulator", IEEJ, (198306), page 225 |