EP2180462 - Keyboard apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitajima, Mitsuru Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2015/29] |
Former [2010/17] | 01 /
Kitajima, Mitsuru Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | Representative(s) | Ascherl, Andreas, et al KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18 80538 München / DE | [2015/29] |
Former [2012/21] | Ascherl, Andreas, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Straße 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/17] | Ettmayr, Andreas, et al Kehl & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Straße 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09170510.3 | 17.09.2009 | [2010/17] | Priority number, date | JP20080245796 | 25.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008245796 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2180462 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2180462 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2180462 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G10C3/12 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
G10C3/12 (EP,US);
G10H1/346 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/17] | G10C3/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2010/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Tastaturvorrichtung | [2010/17] | English: | Keyboard apparatus | [2010/17] | French: | Appareil à clavier | [2010/17] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 24.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2009 | AT | 15.07.2015 | BE | 15.07.2015 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | CZ | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | ES | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | HR | 15.07.2015 | IS | 15.07.2015 | IT | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | MK | 15.07.2015 | MT | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | SM | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | IE | 17.09.2015 | LU | 17.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | NO | 15.10.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 17.09.2009 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 17.09.2015 | ||
LU | 17.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 17.09.2015 | ||
LU | 17.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 17.09.2015 | ||
LU | 17.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 17.09.2015 | ||
LU | 17.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 17.09.2015 | ||
LU | 17.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
LU | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
LU | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
LU | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
LU | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 15.07.2015 | |
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1881481 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [AD] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004261598 (UNO SHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [AD]JPH09269783 (YAMAHA CORP) [AD] 1,11 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP3819136B | JPH09269783 | JP2008026403 |