EP2166051 - REPULPABLE ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/12] | Repulpable adhesive | ||
[2016/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Straße 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Strasse 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | ||
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states TESA SE Quickbornstraße 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ellringmann, Dr. Kai Hein-Kröger-Str. 46a 22589 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Wulf, Dr. Stefan Theekamp 7d 22869 Schenefeld / DE | 03 /
Kerber, Kristin Veilchenweg 18 22529 Hamburg / DE | [2016/33] |
Former [2010/12] | 01 /
Ellringmann, Dr. Kai Goldregenweg 29 22523 Hamburg / DE | ||
02 /
Wulf, Dr. Stefan Dammer Str. 111 40166, Mönchengladbach / DE | |||
03 /
Kerber, Kristin Im Gehölz 7 20252 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09170593.9 | 17.09.2009 | [2010/12] | Priority number, date | DE20081047966 | 18.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008047966 | [2010/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2166051 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2166051 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09J4/00, C08K3/32 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
C09J4/00 (EP,US);
C09J11/02 (KR);
C09J11/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/32 (EP,US);
Y10T156/109 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2852 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/12] | C09J4/00, C08K3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2010/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REPULPIERBARE KLEBMASSEN | [2016/20] | English: | REPULPABLE ADHESIVE | [2016/20] | French: | MASSES COLLANTES POUVANT ÊTRE REFONDUES | [2016/20] |
Former [2010/12] | Repulpierbare Klebmassen | ||
Former [2010/12] | Repulpable adhesive | ||
Former [2010/12] | Masses collantes pouvant être refondues | Examination procedure | 24.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2009 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | ES | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | IS | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | MT | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | SM | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | AT | 17.09.2016 | IE | 17.09.2016 | LU | 17.09.2016 | BE | 30.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | GB | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 17.09.2009 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.09.2016 | ||
IE | 17.09.2016 | ||
LU | 17.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 17.09.2009 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.09.2016 | ||
IE | 17.09.2016 | ||
LU | 17.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 17.09.2009 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.09.2016 | ||
IE | 17.09.2016 | ||
LU | 17.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.09.2016 | ||
IE | 17.09.2016 | ||
LU | 17.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 17.09.2016 | ||
LU | 17.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 17.09.2016 | ||
LU | 17.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 17.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 17.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 17.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | LT | 24.08.2016 | |
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1935956 (TESA AG [DE]) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4569960 (BLAKE FREDERICK D [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1935956 | DE19628317 | DE19830674 | DE19902179 | DE19958223 | DE10058956 | DE10123981 | WO03020623 | WO03024850 | DE10210192 | DE10258667 | DE102004028312 | DE102005051181 | - "TAPPI Useful Methods", TAPPI, (1991), vol. 213 |