EP2165689 - Non-traumatic articulated stretcher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ME.BER. S.r.L. Strada Langhirano, 270 Frazione Fontanini 43010 Parma / IT | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertozzi, Andrea ME.BER. S.r.l. Strada Langhirano, 270 Frazione Fontanini 43010, PARMA / IT | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | Application number, filing date | 09171027.7 | 22.09.2009 | [2010/12] | Priority number, date | IT2008PR00056 | 23.09.2008 Original published format: IT PR20080056 | [2010/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2165689 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2165689 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61G1/013 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
A61G1/003 (EP,US);
A61G1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | Untraumatische Gelenktragbahre | [2010/12] | English: | Non-traumatic articulated stretcher | [2010/12] | French: | Civière articulée non traumatique | [2010/12] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2010 | BE | 01.12.2010 | CY | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | EE | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | HR | 01.12.2010 | HU | 01.12.2010 | LT | 01.12.2010 | LV | 01.12.2010 | MK | 01.12.2010 | MT | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | PL | 01.12.2010 | RO | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | SI | 01.12.2010 | SK | 01.12.2010 | SM | 01.12.2010 | BG | 01.03.2011 | NO | 01.03.2011 | GR | 02.03.2011 | IS | 01.04.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/22] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MK | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
SM | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MK | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MK | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB522529 (NOEL PEMBERTON BILLING) [Y] 11* figure 1 *; | [Y]US3414914 (ROBERT GRAMINS) [Y] 7 * column 1, lines 11-26; figures 1,3 * * column 2, lines 57-63 * * column 3, lines 40-75 *; | [X]US3801208 (BOURGRAF E, et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,10 * column 3; figures 1-5 *; | [XY]GB2122501 (FERNO WASHINGTON) [X] 1-4,6,8,10 * page 1, lines 5-13; figure 1 * * page 2, lines 59-78 * [Y] 7,11; | [X]US2001044966 (LINGER DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9 * paragraph [0033]; figures 1,3 * |