Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2301504
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
14.09.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
11.06.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.03.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
04.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.10.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
13.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.12.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.09.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.09.2011 |
First examination report |
|
19.08.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
27.05.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
25.02.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |