EP2169297 - Optical module comprising an optical deviation element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Vision 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny / FR | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Puente, Jean-Claude 14, Allée des Fossés 93190 Livry Gargan / FR | 02 /
Muller, Jean-Claude 36, rue A. Petremont 93600 Aulnay sous Bois / FR | [2014/04] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
Puente, Jean-Claude 14, Allée des Fossés 93190 LIVRY GARGAN / FR | ||
02 /
Muller, Jean-Claude 36, rue A. Petremont 93600, AULNAY SOUS BOIS / FR | Application number, filing date | 09171210.9 | 24.09.2009 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | FR20080005411 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: FR 0805411 | [2010/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169297 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2169297 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F21V5/00, F21V17/00, F21S8/12, // F21W101/10 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
F21S41/43 (EP,US);
F21S41/26 (EP);
F21S41/295 (EP);
F21W2102/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Optisches Modul, das ein optisches Ablenkelement umfasst | [2010/13] | English: | Optical module comprising an optical deviation element | [2010/13] | French: | Module optique comportant un élément de déviation optique | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.01.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 10.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 10.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2009 | AT | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | CZ | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | ES | 18.06.2014 | FI | 18.06.2014 | HR | 18.06.2014 | IT | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | MK | 18.06.2014 | MT | 18.06.2014 | NL | 18.06.2014 | PL | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | SE | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | SM | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | NO | 18.09.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | GB | 24.09.2014 | IE | 24.09.2014 | LU | 24.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | PT | 20.10.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 24.09.2009 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
GB | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 24.09.2009 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
GB | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
GB | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
GB | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
GB | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
GB | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4811174 (KANZLER JOSEF [AT], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1 - column 8; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US1721611 (WEBSTER FRANK P) [X] 1-3,6-8,10 * page 1 - page 3; figures 1-8 *; | [X]AT398337B (ZIZALA LICHTSYSTEME GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-3,7-8,10 * page 1 - page 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2001019483 (TAKADA KENICHI [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * page 1 - page 5; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | EP1243846 | EP1491816 |