EP2169276 - Control of a continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Italia S.p.A. Via Plava 80 10135 Torino / IT | [2011/08] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states CNH Italia S.p.A. Via Plava 80 10135 Turin / IT | ||
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states CNH Italia S.p.A. Viale delle Nazioni, 55 41100 Modena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morselli, Ricccardo Via medicine 183/i San Vito di Spilamberto 41057 Modena / IT | 02 /
Baroni, Massimo Via S. Michele 4B 42014 Castellarano (RE) / IT | 03 /
Roli, Francesco Via Nazario Sauro 2/3 Vignola 41058 Modena / IT | [2012/43] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
Morselli, Ricccardo Via medicine 183/i San Vito di Spilamberto 41057 Modena / IT | ||
02 /
Baroni, Massimo Via S. Michele 4B 42014 Castellarano (RE) / IT | |||
03 /
Roli, Francesco Via Nazario Sauro 2/3 Vignola 41058 Modena / IT | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | CNH IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | ||
Former [2010/13] | CNH IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 09171521.9 | 28.09.2009 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | IT2008BO00597 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: IT BO20080597 | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169276 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2169276 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/662, // F16H61/46, F16H59/06 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
F16H61/16 (EP,US);
F16H61/462 (EP,US);
F16H61/66259 (EP,US);
B60W2720/10 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/221 (EP,US);
F16H2059/065 (EP,US);
F16H2059/363 (EP,US);
F16H2059/366 (EP,US);
F16H2061/6617 (EP,US);
F16H59/06 (EP,US);
F16H59/36 (EP,US);
F16H61/47 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Steuerung für ein stufenloses Getriebe | [2010/13] | English: | Control of a continuously variable transmission | [2010/13] | French: | Commande d'une transmission à variation continue | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 26.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2009 | AT | 24.10.2012 | BE | 24.10.2012 | CY | 24.10.2012 | CZ | 24.10.2012 | DK | 24.10.2012 | EE | 24.10.2012 | FI | 24.10.2012 | HR | 24.10.2012 | LT | 24.10.2012 | LV | 24.10.2012 | MC | 24.10.2012 | MK | 24.10.2012 | MT | 24.10.2012 | NL | 24.10.2012 | PL | 24.10.2012 | RO | 24.10.2012 | SE | 24.10.2012 | SI | 24.10.2012 | SK | 24.10.2012 | SM | 24.10.2012 | TR | 24.10.2012 | BG | 24.01.2013 | NO | 24.01.2013 | GR | 25.01.2013 | ES | 04.02.2013 | IS | 24.02.2013 | PT | 25.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
MK | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 24.10.2012 | |
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | NO | 24.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007137338 (NISHI EIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0089] - [0099]; figures 1-9 *; | [X]US6343470 (NANRI TAKEHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004014557 (CARLSON RYAN R [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1609659 (KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2007137388 | US6343470 |