EP2172887 - System and method for dynamic multi-objective optimization of machine selection, integration and utilization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sustaeta, Angel 5901 Mountain Villa Drive Austin, TX 78731 / US | 02 /
Lin, Ka-Hing 49 Landsdown Cres. Markham Ontario / CA | 03 /
Snyder, Ric 4603 Lime Stone Circle Austin, TX 78731 / US | 04 /
Theron, John Christopher 545 Mystic Way Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | 05 /
Funderburk, Mark 7200 Villa Maria Lane Austin, TX 78759 / US | 06 /
Sugars, Michael Eugene 168 Lower Elgin Rd Elgin, TX 78621 / US | 07 /
Discenzo, Frederick M. 8513 Timber Trail Brecksville, OH 44141 / US | 08 /
Baier, John J. 9072 Wren Court 44060, OH Mentor / US | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09171632.4 | 29.09.2009 | [2010/14] | Priority number, date | US20080242525 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: US 242525 | US20080242529 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: US 242529 | US20080242544 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: US 242544 | US20080242546 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: US 242546 | US20080242552 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: US 242552 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2172887 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2172887 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
G06Q10/04 (EP);
G05B23/0283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur dynamischen Mehrfachobjektoptimierung zur Maschinenauswahl, Integration und Verwendung | [2010/14] | English: | System and method for dynamic multi-objective optimization of machine selection, integration and utilization | [2010/14] | French: | Système et procédé pour l'optimisation dynamique multi-objectifs de sélection, intégration et utilisation de machines | [2010/14] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 13.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.06.2017 | 13.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/51] | 11.08.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IL]US2003061004 (DISCENZO FREDERICK M [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * [L] 1-15; | [IL]US2004267395 (DISCENZO FREDERICK M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * [L] 1-15 | by applicant | US20030674966 | US20020214927 | US20010311880 | US20010311596 |