EP2175636 - Method and system for integrating virtual entities within live video [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, Kelly J. Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Buster, Duke Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09172233.0 | 05.10.2009 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | US20080249339 | 10.10.2008 Original published format: US 249339 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175636 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/262, H04N5/272, G06T17/40 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
H04N5/262 (EP,US);
G06T17/05 (EP,US);
G06T19/006 (EP,US);
H04N5/2226 (EP,US);
H04N5/272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Integrierung virtueller Entitäten in einem Live-Video | [2010/15] | English: | Method and system for integrating virtual entities within live video | [2010/15] | French: | Procédé et système pour intégrer des entités virtuelles dans une vidéo en direct | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9845814 (SYNAPIX INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 38, line 16 - page 52, line 2 *; | [X]US6052648 (BURFEIND CRAIG R [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 39; figures 1-12 *; | [X]US2003043270 (RAFEY RICHTER A [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2005120071 (L 3 COMM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US2006223637 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0091] , [0092] , [0104] - [0111]; figures 1,4,5,7,11 *; | [A]WO2008011515 (WORLD GOLF TOUR INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10* page 8, paragraph 40 - page 11, paragraph 49; figures 3-7 * | by applicant | WO9845814 | US6052648 | US2003043270 | US2006223637 |