Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] |
10.06.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.11.2012 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.10.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.07.2011 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
23.03.2011 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
28.05.2010 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
12.03.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] |
12.03.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] |
12.03.2010 | First examination report | |
27.01.2010 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |