EP2174553 - Cultured Dairy Products and Methods of Manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kraft Foods Global Brands LLC Three Lakes Drive Northfield, IL 60093 / US | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sweley, Jess C 7818 Shirley Street Omaha NC 68124 / US | 02 /
Smith, Gary F 759 Fairhope Avenue Glenview IL 60025 / US | 03 /
Apel, Lisa J 1140 Maple Avenue, No. 2 Evanston IL 60202 / US | 04 /
Kincaid, Carrie M 222 Main Street, Unit 204 Evanston IL 60202 / US | 05 /
Kalamas, Thomas M 6220 Swiss Road Castorland NY 13620 / US | 06 /
Cha, Alice S 3126 Wisperwoods Court Northbrook IL 60062 / US | 07 /
Barton, Dawn J 1600 Central Street Evanston IL 60201 / US | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Murray, Adrian D'Coligny WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Murray, Adrian D'Coligny W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09172290.0 | 06.10.2009 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | US20080250218 | 13.10.2008 Original published format: US 250218 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2174553 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2174553 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/137, A23C19/082 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
A23C19/082 (EP,US);
A23C19/028 (EP,US);
A23C19/0765 (EP,US);
A23C19/09 (EP,US);
A23C9/137 (EP,US);
A23C2210/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/15] | Title | German: | Kultivierte Milchprodukte und Herstellungsverfahren | [2010/15] | English: | Cultured Dairy Products and Methods of Manufacture | [2010/15] | French: | Produits laitiers cultivés et procédés de fabrication | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/37] | 20.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3749583 (COX C, et al); | [ID]US6558761 (VANDEVIJVER ERIC [BE], et al); | [XI]EP1386540 (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US]); | [I]EP1579769 (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US]); | [XI]US2005214430 (LAYE ISABELLE M [US], et al); | [X]EP1733622 (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US]); | [XI]US2008160133 (BROOKS TAMARA VAUGHN [US], et al) | by applicant | US2387276 | US4597971 | US5079024 | US5180604 | US5656320 | US6406736 | US6416797 | US6419975 | US6558761 | US6558716 | US6861080 |