EP2244457 - Broadcasting processing apparatus and control method of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lim, Chea-il Jugong 5-danji Apt.523-1202 Maetan 1-dong Yeongto Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09172392.4 | 07.10.2009 | [2010/43] | Priority number, date | KR20090034061 | 20.04.2009 Original published format: KR 20090034061 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2244457 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/00, H04N7/167, G06F1/32, G06F21/00, H04N5/63, H04H20/00 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
H04N21/6543 (EP,US);
H04N7/167 (KR);
H04H20/40 (EP,US);
H04H60/15 (EP,US);
H04H60/23 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/43607 (EP,US);
H04N21/4436 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rundfunkverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2010/43] | English: | Broadcasting processing apparatus and control method of the same | [2010/43] | French: | Appareil de traitement de diffusion et son procédé de commande | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 11.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 30.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/17] | 07.12.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0895415 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0020] , [0028] *; | [A]WO2008155681 (NDS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3 *; | [A]EP1739967 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6337719 (CUCCIA DAVID W [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004093614 (SAKURAI ATSUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 6 * | [Y] - CI Plus LLP, "CI Plus Specification. Content Security Extensions to the Common Interface", (20081130), pages 1 - 242, URL: http://www.ci-plus.com/data/ci-plus_specification_v1.1.pdf, (20100701), XP002590343 [Y] 1-15 * pages 93-97 * | by applicant | EP0895415 |