EP2175577 - Apparatus and methods for broadcasting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MMI Broadcasting Ltd. 702 Ontario Tower London E14 9JA / GB | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Airamo, Teemu Flat 702, Ontario Tower Poplar, E14 9JA / GB | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Hill, Justin John, et al Ipulse (IP) Ltd. Carrington House 126-130 Regent Street London W1B 5SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Hill, Justin John, et al IPULSE 9-10 Savile Row London, W1S 3PF / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | Hill, Justin John McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate London, Greater London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 09172731.3 | 09.10.2009 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | US20080104232P | 09.10.2008 Original published format: US 104232 P | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2175577 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2175577 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04H20/40 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
H04H20/40 (EP,US);
H04H20/57 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für Rundfunkübertragung | [2010/15] | English: | Apparatus and methods for broadcasting | [2010/15] | French: | Appareil et procédés pour la diffusion | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007014536 (HELLMAN MARTIN E [US]) [X] 1-3,7-12,15 * figures 1,2,8 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0092] , [0093] , [0101] - [0123] - [0127] , [0167] - [0169] - [0187] - [0195] * * paragraphs [0208] , [0236] , [0258] - [0262] - [0284] , [0287] , [0309] , [0315] - [0320] - [0343] * * paragraphs [0481] , [0485] , [ 492] - [0494] * [Y] 4-6,13,14; | [Y]US6834156 (MARKO PAUL D [US], et al) [Y] 4-6,13,14 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] *; | [A]EP1760916 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 15 * paragraph [0001] *; | [XA]US2008165906 (HO EDWIN [US], et al) [X] 8 * figures 2,4 * * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] , [0021] , [0023] , [0028] * [A] 5,14; | [YA]WO02102079 (GROTUIT MEDIA INC [US]) [Y] 4,6,13 * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 5 * * page 13, line 13 - page 13, line 30 * [A] 5,14 |