EP2309351 - Safety control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haberstroh, Frank Dobel 13 79183, Waldkirch / DE | 02 /
Cellier, Cyril Damenstr. 6 79183, Waldkirch / DE | [2012/50] |
Former [2011/15] | 01 /
Haberstroh, Frank Dobel 13 79183, Waldkirch / DE | ||
02 /
Cellier, Cyril Damenstr. 6 79183, Waldkirch / DE | Representative(s) | Ludewigt, Christoph Sick AG Intellectual Property Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2012/50] |
Former [2011/15] | Ludewigt, Christoph Sick AG Patentabteilung Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | Application number, filing date | 09172776.8 | 12.10.2009 | [2011/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2309351 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2309351 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05B9/02 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
G05B9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | Sicherheitssteuerung | [2011/15] | English: | Safety control | [2011/15] | French: | Commande de sécurité | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 07.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.09.2013
09.10.2013
WITHDRAWN Wieland Electric GmbH Brenner Str. 10-14 96052 Bamberg / DE Opponent's representative 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02
12.09.2013
09.10.2013
WITHDRAWN Pilz GmbH & Co. KG Felix-Wankel-Str.2 73760 Ostfildern / DE Opponent's representative Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/25] |
Former [2018/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.09.2013
09.10.2013
ADMISSIBLE Wieland Electric GmbH Brenner Str. 10-14 96052 Bamberg / DE Opponent's representative 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
12.09.2013
09.10.2013
WITHDRAWN Pilz GmbH & Co. KG Felix-Wankel-Str.2 73760 Ostfildern / DE Opponent's representative Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2016/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.09.2013
09.10.2013
ADMISSIBLE Wieland Electric GmbH Brenner Str. 10-14 96052 Bamberg / DE Opponent's representative Harbach, Ulrich Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Eschersheimer Landstraße 105-107 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
12.09.2013
09.10.2013
WITHDRAWN Pilz GmbH & Co. KG Felix-Wankel-Str.2 73760 Ostfildern / DE Opponent's representative Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Phoenixbau Königstraße 5 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2014/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.09.2013
09.10.2013
ADMISSIBLE Wieland Electric GmbH Brenner Str. 10-14 96052 Bamberg / DE Opponent's representative Harbach, Ulrich Tergau & Walkenhorst Eschersheimer Landstraße 105-107 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
12.09.2013
09.10.2013
WITHDRAWN Pilz GmbH & Co. KG Felix-Wankel-Str.2 73760 Ostfildern / DE Opponent's representative Duhme, Torsten Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Phoenixbau Königstraße 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2013/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.09.2013
09.10.2013
ADMISSIBLE Wieland Electric GmbH Brenner Str. 10-14 96052 Bamberg / DE Opponent's representative Harbach, Ulrich Tergau & Walkenhorst Eschersheimer Landstraße 105-107 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
12.09.2013
09.10.2013
ADMISSIBLE Pilz GmbH & Co. KG Felix-Wankel-Str.2 73760 Ostfildern / DE Opponent's representative Duhme, Torsten Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Phoenixbau Königstraße 5 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2013/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.09.2013
Wieland Electric GmbH Brenner Str. 10-14 96052 Bamberg / DE | ||
02
12.09.2013
Pilz GmbH & Co. KG Felix-Wankel-Str.2 73760 Ostfildern / DE Opponent's representative Duhme, Torsten Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Phoenixbau Königstraße 5 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | 22.10.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.01.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.01.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/11] | Appeal following opposition | 12.05.2015 | Appeal received No. T0988/15 | 07.07.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.01.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2009 | CY | 12.12.2012 | CZ | 12.12.2012 | DK | 12.12.2012 | EE | 12.12.2012 | FI | 12.12.2012 | HR | 12.12.2012 | IT | 12.12.2012 | LT | 12.12.2012 | LV | 12.12.2012 | MC | 12.12.2012 | MK | 12.12.2012 | MT | 12.12.2012 | NL | 12.12.2012 | PL | 12.12.2012 | RO | 12.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2012 | SI | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | SM | 12.12.2012 | TR | 12.12.2012 | BG | 12.03.2013 | NO | 12.03.2013 | GR | 13.03.2013 | ES | 23.03.2013 | IS | 12.04.2013 | PT | 12.04.2013 | IE | 12.10.2013 | LU | 12.10.2013 | BE | 31.10.2013 | AT | 12.10.2014 | GB | 12.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2018/35] |
Former [2016/12] | HU | 12.10.2009 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
MK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
SM | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.10.2013 | ||
LU | 12.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
AT | 12.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 12.10.2009 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
MK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
SM | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.10.2013 | ||
LU | 12.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 12.10.2009 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
MK | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
SM | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.10.2013 | ||
LU | 12.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
MK | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
SM | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
SM | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
NO | 12.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2003030330 (PULLMANN JURGEN [DE]) [YD] 1 * paragraph [0062] *; | [Y]US6246318 (VEIL RICHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 14 - line 24 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 13 * | by applicant | EP1269274 | US6246318 |