EP2269501 - System for detection and treatment of infection or inflammation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waegener International AG Grabenstrasse 25 6340 Baar / CH | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Dewaegenaere, Levi Emmerik A. Huldekens 2 2970 s'-Gravenwezel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dewaegenaere, Levi Emmerik A. Huldekens 2 2970 S'Gravenwezel / BE | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Heunemann, Dieter Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | Heunemann, Dieter Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09172914.5 | 13.10.2009 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | EP20090164535 | 03.07.2009 Original published format: EP 09164535 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269501 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B18/00, A61F7/00 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
A61B5/015 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0056 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0075 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0095 (EP,US);
A61F7/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zur Detektion und Behandlung von Infektionen oder Entzündungen | [2011/01] | English: | System for detection and treatment of infection or inflammation | [2011/01] | French: | Système de détection et de traitement des infections ou inflammations | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE20019614U (WEHBERG HEINRICH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-11,16 * the whole document *; | [X]US4548212 (LEUNG FRANK K [US]) [X] 1-16 * column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 45; figures 1-10 * * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 68; claims 1-7 * | by applicant | US6017337 |