EP2177714 - Blade for a low pressure section of a steam turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riaz, Muhammad Saqib 2475 Brookshire Drive Apt No. 65 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
Stathopoulos, Dimitrios 67 Corrit Drive Delmar, NY 12054 / US | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2010/16] | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09172979.8 | 14.10.2009 | [2010/16] | Priority number, date | US20080205942 | 14.10.2008 Original published format: US 205942 | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2177714 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2177714 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D5/22, F01D5/28 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
F01D5/14 (EP,US);
F01D5/141 (EP,US);
F01D5/225 (EP,US);
F01D5/28 (EP,US);
F05D2220/31 (EP,US);
F05D2300/171 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Laufschaufel für einen Niederdruckabschnitt einer Dampfturbine | [2010/16] | English: | Blade for a low pressure section of a steam turbine engine | [2010/16] | French: | Aube mobile pour une section basse pression d'une turbine à vapeur | [2010/16] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 10.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 22.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0985801 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,12,13* paragraphs [0051] , [0052] , [0065]; figures 1,12 *; | [X]JP2000274201 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,11-13 * paragraphs [0006] - [0014]; figures 1,2,5 *; | [Y]US6341941 (NAMURA KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 14,15 * figures 4-8 *; | [XY]US2003049131 (MURAKAMI ITARU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,11-13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0010] , [0037] , [0038] , [0085]; figures 4a,4b,7; claims 2,3,8 * [Y] 3,10,14; | [Y]DE20023475U (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [Y] 10,14 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0028] , [0031] , [0032]; figures 2a,b *; | [XY]US2004126235 (BARB KEVIN JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11-13 * paragraph [0014]; figure 2 * [Y] 14,15; | [X]US2008206065 (YAMASHITA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,11-15 * paragraphs [0014] , [0056] , [0071] , [0072]; figures 1,2,6,7,9 *; | [Y]EP1970535 (ABB TURBO SYSTEMS AG [CH]) [Y] 3 * figure 1 * |