EP2312011 - Method for metallic coating of a casting mould part and aluminized casting mould part produced according to the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg Fischer Automotive AG Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menk, Werner Pilatusstrasse 33 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | 02 /
Eckardt, Thomas Hillerstrasse 52 50931 Köln / DE | 03 /
Rieck, Torsten Schleiferstrasse 25 40878 Ratingen / DE | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | De Colle, Piergiacomo, et al Georg Fischer AG Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | De Colle, Piergiacomo, et al Georg Fischer AG Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 09173138.0 | 15.10.2009 | [2011/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2312011 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/02, C23C2/12, C23C2/26, C23C2/28 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
C23C2/12 (EP);
C23C2/024 (EP,US);
C23C2/26 (EP,US);
C23C2/261 (EP,US);
C23C2/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur metallischen Beschichtung eines Gussformteiles und aluminisiertes Gussformteil hergestellt durch das Verfahren | [2011/16] | English: | Method for metallic coating of a casting mould part and aluminized casting mould part produced according to the method | [2011/16] | French: | Procédé de revêtement métallique d'une pièce de formage coulée et pièce de formage coulée fabriquée selon ce procédé | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 29.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3000755 (HANINK DEAN K, et al) [X] 1-2,6 * claim 9 * * column 3, lines 50-65 *; | [A]DE1138603 (KAISER ALUMINIUM CHEM CORP) [A] 5-7,14-15 * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 65 *; | [XI]US3617345 (BROWN MELVIN H, et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,12,14-15 * the whole document * [I] 4,9-11,13; | [A]US5853806 (HIGUCHI SEIJUN [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,6-8 * column 6, line 55 - column 10, line 50 * * column 16, lines 1-3 *; | [A]EP1525929 (FISCHER GEORG FAHRZEUGTECH [CH]) [A] 12* paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0011] *; | [A]EP1624093 (ALUMINAL OBERFLAECHENTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 9-11 * paragraphs [0010] , [0029] , [0031] *; | [A]US2008318035 (SEBRIGHT BETH ANN [US]) [A] 13-14 * claims 10,13,14 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0019] , [0025] - [0028] *; | [A]EP2017074 (TI AUTOMOTIVE HEIDELBERG GMBH [DE]) [A] 4 * claims 13-15 * * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0026] * | by applicant | EP0848076 |