EP2180331 - Systems and methods for controlling a satellite navigation receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states O2 Micro, Inc. 3118 Patrick Henry Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Xiaoguang Room No. 806, Huale Business Center No.716 Luoyu Road, Hongsham District Wuhan 430074 / CN | 02 /
Wang, Hongzhang Room No. 806, Huale Business Center No. 716 Luoyu Road, Hongshan District Wuhan 430074 / CN | [2011/49] |
Former [2010/17] | 01 /
Yu, Xiaoguang Room No. 806, Huale Business Center No.716 Luoyu Road, Hongsham District Wuhan 430074 / CN | ||
02 /
Wang, Hongzhang Room No. 806, Huale Business Center No. 716 Luoyu Road, Hongshan District Wuhan 430074 / CN | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2010/17] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 09173393.1 | 19.10.2009 | [2010/17] | Priority number, date | US20080196825P | 21.10.2008 Original published format: US 196825 P | US20090545994 | 24.08.2009 Original published format: US 545994 | US20090568950 | 29.09.2009 Original published format: US 568950 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2180331 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2180331 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2180331 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/00, G01S19/34 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
G01S19/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/17] | G01S1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Satellitennavigationsempfängers | [2010/17] | English: | Systems and methods for controlling a satellite navigation receiver | [2010/17] | French: | Systèmes et procédés de commande de récepteur de navigation de satellite | [2010/17] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 14.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2009 | AT | 07.12.2011 | BE | 07.12.2011 | CY | 07.12.2011 | CZ | 07.12.2011 | DK | 07.12.2011 | EE | 07.12.2011 | FI | 07.12.2011 | HR | 07.12.2011 | IT | 07.12.2011 | LT | 07.12.2011 | LV | 07.12.2011 | MK | 07.12.2011 | MT | 07.12.2011 | NL | 07.12.2011 | PL | 07.12.2011 | RO | 07.12.2011 | SE | 07.12.2011 | SI | 07.12.2011 | SK | 07.12.2011 | SM | 07.12.2011 | TR | 07.12.2011 | BG | 07.03.2012 | NO | 07.03.2012 | GR | 08.03.2012 | ES | 18.03.2012 | IS | 07.04.2012 | PT | 09.04.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 19.10.2009 | |
AT | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
SM | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
SM | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 07.12.2011 | |
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 07.12.2011 | |
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 07.12.2011 | |
NO | 07.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002004708 (FARINE PIERRE-ANDRE [CH], et al) [X] 1-5,10,12,14 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [00 8] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0023] , [0024] , [0026] , [0027] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0035] - [0037] * * paragraphs [0040] , [0044] , [0045] , [0047] , [0052] * * figure 3A * [I] 6-9,11,13,15-17; | [X]US2005275587 (SIEGEL NEIL G [US], et al) [X] 1,10,12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0015] , [0017] , [0026] , [0027] *; | [X]US2007276583 (DOBECK BRIAN R [US], et al) [X] 1,10,12 * paragraphs [0041] , [0043] *; | [X]US2008150797 (JIA ZHIKE [US], et al) [X] 1,10,12* paragraph [0027] * | by applicant | US2002004708 | US2005275587 |