EP2189113 - Multifunctional electronic device and method for using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIH (Hong Kong) Limited 8/F, Peninsula Tower 538 Castle Peak Road Cheung Sha Wan Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states FIH (Hong Kong) Limited 8/F, Peninsula Tower 538 Castle Peak Road Cheng Sha Wan Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Che-Jui 15 F, No.207-1, Sec.3 Peishin Road Shindian City 231, Taipei Hsien / TW | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Craven, Ian Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Craven, Ian Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09173439.2 | 19.10.2009 | [2010/21] | Priority number, date | CN20081305659 | 20.11.2008 Original published format: CN200810305659 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2189113 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2189113 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/16, G06F1/00, H04M1/725, G06Q10/00, A61B5/00 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
G06F1/1613 (EP,US);
A61B5/486 (EP,US);
G06F1/1626 (EP,US);
G06F1/1684 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0276 (EP,US);
A61B5/6897 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | A61B5/16, G06F1/00, H04M1/725, G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektronische Mehrfunktionsvorrichtung und Verfahren zu deren Verwendung | [2010/21] | English: | Multifunctional electronic device and method for using the same | [2010/21] | French: | Dispositif électronique polyvalent et son procédé d'utilisation | [2010/21] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 28.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003149344 (NIZAN YANIV [IL]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0103] *; | [XI]WO9951144 (PARK THOMAS MICHAEL [AU], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11,15,16 * page 4, line 10 - page 7, line 12 * [I] 12,13; | [I]US2002083122 (LEMCHEN MARC S [US]) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0024] - [0031] *; | [I]US6190314 (ARK WENDY S [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * column 3, line 13 - column 6, line 54 * |