EP2187494 - Protection device for electric motors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRIWAN INDUSTRIE-ELEKTRONIK GMBH Allmand 11 74670 Forchtenberg / DE | [2010/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kriwan, Friedrich In den Zeiläckern 19 74670 Forchtenberg / DE | 02 /
Peng, Xiaoming Trajanstraße 19 74613 Öhringen / DE | [2012/22] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
Kriwan, Friedrich In den Zeiläckern 19 74670, Forchtenberg / DE | ||
02 /
Peng, Xiaoming Trajanstraße 19 74613, Öhringen / DE | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Michael, et al Tetzner & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Tetzner, Michael, et al Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09173817.9 | 22.10.2009 | [2010/20] | Priority number, date | DE20081057070 | 13.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008057070 | [2010/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2187494 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2187494 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2187494 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/085, H02H9/02, G01R31/34, H02H5/04 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
H02H7/0852 (EP);
H02H5/04 (EP);
G01R31/343 (EP);
H02H9/026 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/20] | H02H7/085, H02H9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/20] | Title | German: | Schutzeinrichtung für elektrische Motoren | [2010/20] | English: | Protection device for electric motors | [2010/20] | French: | Dispositif de protection pour moteurs électriques | [2010/20] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 02.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2009 | CY | 01.08.2012 | CZ | 01.08.2012 | EE | 01.08.2012 | FI | 01.08.2012 | HR | 01.08.2012 | LT | 01.08.2012 | LV | 01.08.2012 | MK | 01.08.2012 | MT | 01.08.2012 | NL | 01.08.2012 | PL | 01.08.2012 | RO | 01.08.2012 | SE | 01.08.2012 | SI | 01.08.2012 | SK | 01.08.2012 | SM | 01.08.2012 | TR | 01.08.2012 | IE | 22.10.2012 | LU | 22.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 01.11.2012 | NO | 01.11.2012 | GR | 02.11.2012 | ES | 12.11.2012 | IS | 01.12.2012 | PT | 03.12.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 22.10.2009 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
SM | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
LU | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
SM | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
LU | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 01.08.2012 | |
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 01.08.2012 | |
NO | 01.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3644864 (HIRSBRUNNER HANS G, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19540625 | DE19822056 | US3644864 |