EP2144241 - Reproducing apparatus, correlated information notifying method, and correlated information notifying program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morisawa, Yujin c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kinouchi, Takashi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hideo, Tsukazaki c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ozawa, Takeshi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Busse, Carola, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09173834.4 | 26.10.2006 | [2010/02] | Priority number, date | JP20050311507 | 26.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005311507 | JP20060237496 | 01.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006237496 | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2144241 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2144241 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B27/34 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (KR);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F16/64 (EP,US);
G06F16/68 (EP,US);
G06F16/683 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/02] | Title | German: | Wiedergabevorrichtung, Verfahren zur Mitteilung von korrelierender Information und Mitteilungsprogramm für korrelierte Information | [2010/02] | English: | Reproducing apparatus, correlated information notifying method, and correlated information notifying program | [2010/02] | French: | Appareil de reproduction, procédé de notification d'informations corrélées et programme de notification d'informations corrélées | [2010/02] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 22.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 07.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.05.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06123030.6 / EP1780723 | Divisional application(s) | EP16178174.5 / EP3093850 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060123030) is 10.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003191753 (HOCH MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP1494403 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1513292 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2006121200 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1-15 * figures 1-18 *; | [E]EP1742222 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-15 * figures 1-23 *; | [E]WO2007029436 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1,15 * figures 9,15 *; | [E]EP1783593 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1-15 * figures 37-47 * | Examination | US6209011 | by applicant | JP2003050816 |