EP2181586 - A method of cleaning animal cages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Detach AB Sundbyvägen 24 645 51 Strängnäs / SE | [2013/12] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Detach AB Sundbyvägen 24 645 51 Strangnas / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nilsson, Magnus / Mårtenstorp 13 274 62 Rydsgård / SE | [2013/12] |
Former [2010/18] | 01 /
Nilsson, Magnus Mårtenstorp 13 274 62, RYDSGARD / SE | Representative(s) | Rosenquist, Per Olof, et al Patentbyrån Y Wallengren AB P.O. Box 116 331 21 Värnamo / SE | [2013/41] |
Former [2013/27] | Rosenquist, Per Olof Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB P.O. Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/18] | Rosenquist, Per Olof Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB P.O. Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09174070.4 | 26.10.2009 | [2010/18] | Priority number, date | SE20080002332 | 03.11.2008 Original published format: SE 0802332 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2181586 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2181586 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/03 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
A01K1/03 (EP,US);
A01K1/01 (SE);
A01K1/031 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Tierkäfigen | [2010/18] | English: | A method of cleaning animal cages | [2010/18] | French: | Procédé pour le nettoyage de cages pour animaux | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2009 | AT | 03.07.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | CY | 03.07.2013 | CZ | 03.07.2013 | DK | 03.07.2013 | EE | 03.07.2013 | FI | 03.07.2013 | HR | 03.07.2013 | LT | 03.07.2013 | LV | 03.07.2013 | MC | 03.07.2013 | MK | 03.07.2013 | MT | 03.07.2013 | PL | 03.07.2013 | RO | 03.07.2013 | SE | 03.07.2013 | SI | 03.07.2013 | SK | 03.07.2013 | SM | 03.07.2013 | TR | 03.07.2013 | NO | 03.10.2013 | GR | 04.10.2013 | ES | 14.10.2013 | IE | 26.10.2013 | LU | 26.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | IS | 03.11.2013 | PT | 04.11.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 26.10.2009 | |
AT | 03.07.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MK | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
SM | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.10.2013 | ||
LU | 26.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MK | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
SM | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
SM | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 03.07.2013 | |
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 03.07.2013 | |
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 03.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US6394033 (TROGSTAM H MIKAEL [SE], et al); | [X]US2007119382 (AUSTIN DARYL [US], et al) | by applicant | US6394033 |