EP2181833 - Method and device for simultaneous extrusion of two tubes of a synthetic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corelco SAS 390 Route de Dommartin 01570 Manziat / FR | [2010/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Courant, Alain Le Mulfier 01190 Chavannes sur Reyssouze / FR | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2010/18] | Tetaz, Franck Claude Edouard, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09174423.5 | 29.10.2009 | [2010/18] | Priority number, date | FR20080057389 | 30.10.2008 Original published format: FR 0857389 | [2010/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2181833 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/12, B29C47/20, B29C47/26 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
B29C48/345 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/11 (EP,US);
B29C48/302 (EP,US);
B29C48/325 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29L2031/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum gleichzeitigen Strangpressen von zwei Rohren aus Synthetikmaterial | [2010/18] | English: | Method and device for simultaneous extrusion of two tubes of a synthetic material | [2010/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'extrusion simultanée de deux tubes en matériau synthétique | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 15.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/51] | 01.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2788543 (DINSCH FRED L) [A] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 15 - line 59 * * column 4, line 68 - column 6, line 3 ** figure - *; | [A]US3932090 (BRUMLIK GEORGE C) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 13 - line 29 * * column 8, line 11 - line 27 * * figure 24 *; | [A]FR2758107 (FM PLASTICS SARL [FR]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 26 * * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 25 * * page 7, line 18 - line 31 * * figures 6,9,10 * |