EP2182015 - Weather resistant thermoplastic resin having excellent low gloss characteristics and method of preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEIL INDUSTRIES INC. 290 Gongdan-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-710 / KR | [2013/02] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Cheil Industries Inc. 290 Gongdan-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-710 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jin, Young Sub c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Sung Kwan Cheil Industries Inc. 62, Pyeongyeo-dong, Yeosu-si Jeollanam-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Hwan Seok c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Hong, Jae Keun c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Lee, Byeong Do c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Sun, Ho Ryong c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Jang, Bong Sil c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 08 /
Lim, Chul In c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/02] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
Jin, Young Sub c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Sung Kwan Cheil Industries Inc. 62, Pyeongyeo-dong, Yeosu-si Jeollanam-do / KR | |||
03 /
Park, Hwan Seok c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Hong, Jae Keun c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Lee, Byeong Do c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
06 /
Sun, Ho Ryong c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
07 /
Jang, Bong Sil c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
08 /
Lim, Chul In c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
Former [2010/18] | 01 /
Jin, Young Sub c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Sung Kwan c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Park, Hwan Seok c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Hong, Jae Keun c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Lee, Byeong Do c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
06 /
Sun, Ho Ryong c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
07 /
Jang, Bong Sil c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
08 /
Lim, Chul In c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2. Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/18] | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09174487.0 | 29.10.2009 | [2010/18] | Priority number, date | KR20080106664 | 29.10.2008 Original published format: KR 20080106664 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2182015 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2182015 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08F265/06, C08L25/12, C08L33/08, C08L33/10 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
C08L33/08 (EP,US);
C08L33/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L25/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2201/02 (KR);
C08L33/18 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/12, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L33/08, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/18] | Title | German: | Wetterfester thermoplastischer Harz mit ausgezeichneten geringen Glanzeigenschaften und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2010/18] | English: | Weather resistant thermoplastic resin having excellent low gloss characteristics and method of preparing the same | [2010/18] | French: | Résine thermoplastique résistante aux intempéries et dotée d'excellentes caractéristiques à faible brillance et son procédé de préparation | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2009 | BE | 09.01.2013 | CY | 09.01.2013 | CZ | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | EE | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | HR | 09.01.2013 | LT | 09.01.2013 | LV | 09.01.2013 | MC | 09.01.2013 | MK | 09.01.2013 | MT | 09.01.2013 | NL | 09.01.2013 | PL | 09.01.2013 | RO | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | SI | 09.01.2013 | SK | 09.01.2013 | SM | 09.01.2013 | TR | 09.01.2013 | BG | 09.04.2013 | NO | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | ES | 20.04.2013 | IS | 09.05.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 29.10.2009 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
MK | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
MK | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 09.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19614846 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * example 6 *; | [X]US3944631 (YU ARTHUR J, et al) [X] 1 * column 9, lines 17-20; claim 1 * * column 1, lines 31,32 * * abstract *; | [X]US6890965 (JOHNSON LOWELL FRANK [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 11, lines 24-56; example 1; claims 20-23 * * column 3, lines 51,52 * | by applicant | US6696165 | US6395828 | US5475053 | US4652614 | US4169869 | US4460742 | US5580924 | KR20080036790 | US4668737 | US5237004 | US3426101 | US6187862 | JPH07316243 | KR100440474B | KR20060051425 | US5910553 | US6111024 | US6051656 |