EP2194719 - Video transcoding system with quality readjustment based on scene change detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ViXS Systems Inc. 1210 Sheppard Ave. E. Suite 800 Toronto, ON M2K 1E3 / CA | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramachandran, Avinash 77 Davisville Avenue, Unit 2815 Toronto Ontario M4S 1G4 / CA | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09174713.9 | 30.10.2009 | [2010/23] | Priority number, date | US20080261218 | 30.10.2008 Original published format: US 261218 | [2010/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2194719 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2194719 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/00, H04N7/24 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
H04N19/107 (EP,US);
H04N19/142 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/40 (EP,US);
H04N19/87 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/23] | H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Videoumcodierungssystem mit Qualitätskorrektur auf Grundlage einer Szenenwechselerkennung | [2010/23] | English: | Video transcoding system with quality readjustment based on scene change detection | [2010/23] | French: | Système de transcodage vidéo avec un réajustement de qualité basé sur une détection de changement de scène | [2010/23] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 14.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/02] | 21.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0139508 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [I] 1-3,5,8-10,12 * pages 1-5; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US2007074266 (RAVEENDRAN VIJAYALAKSHMI R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] - [0071] , [0120] - [0211] * [I] 6,13; | [A]GB2306833 (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO02071639 (INTERVIDEO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |