EP2201837 - Use of polymers of quaternary ammonium compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/26] | Use of polymers of quaternary ammonium compounds | ||
[2013/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arcana Pool Systems GmbH Brünner Straße 186 2201 Gerasdorf bei Wien / AT | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Werner Himmelreichstraße 10 3003 Gablitz / AT | [2014/03] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
Müller, Werner Himmelreichstraße 10 3003 Gablitz / AT | Representative(s) | Pawloy, Peter Michael Sonn Patentanwälte OG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Pawloy, Peter Michael Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2010/26] | Pawloy, Peter Michael Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 09174896.2 | 03.11.2009 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | AT20080001735 | 07.11.2008 Original published format: AT 17352008 | [2010/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2201837 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2201837 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2201837 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N33/02, A01N33/12, A01P1/00, C02F1/76 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
C02F1/76 (EP);
A01N33/12 (EP);
C02F2103/42 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N33/12, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N33/12, A01N25/10, A01N33/12 (EP) |
Former IPC [2010/26] | A01N33/02, A01N33/12, A01P1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Polymeren quaternärer Ammoniumverbindungen | [2010/26] | English: | Use of polymers of quaternary ammonium compounds | [2013/34] | French: | Utilisation de polymères de liaisons d'ammonium quaternaires | [2010/26] |
Former [2010/26] | Use of polymers of quaternary ammonium compounds | Examination procedure | 04.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 18.04.2013 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 11.06.2013 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 26.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | HR | 15.01.2014 | IT | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | MK | 15.01.2014 | MT | 15.01.2014 | NL | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | SM | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | NO | 15.04.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | BG | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
TR | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | BG | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
TR | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0009453 (CLEAR VALUE INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 1, line 12 - line 29 * * page 9, line 16 - line 24 * * page 13, line 6 - line 9 *; | [A]WO9734834 (BIO LAB INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * example 13 *; | EP0371308 [ ] (BAYROL CHEM FAB GMBH [DE]) [ ] * page 3, line 6 - line 53 * * page 6, line 17 - line 20 *; | [A]US4923619 (LEGROS ALAIN C A G [BE]) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 7 - line 44 * * column 10, line 12 - line 37 *; | [A]US2004062744 (MIYAMOTO HIDEKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0026] *; | [A]EP0456467 (ALCON LAB INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 28 *; | [A]US5096601 (MUIA RAMON A [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 4, line 6 - line 47 * | [A] - BOLTO ET AL, "Soluble polymers in water purification", PROGRESS IN POLYMER SCIENCE, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 20, no. 6, doi:10.1016/0079-6700(95)00010-D, ISSN 0079-6700, (19950101), pages 987 - 1041, (19950101), XP022703699 [A] 1-13 * page 1002; compound IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0079-6700(95)00010-D |