EP2323392 - Method and apparatus for measuring delay within a compressed digital stream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tektronix International Sales GmbH Rheingoldstrasse 50 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall Schaffhausen / CH | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Norman, Martin Alan C/O Tektronix U.K. Ltd Endeavour House, Chivers Way Histon, Cambridge, CB24 9ZR / GB | 02 /
Robinson, Paul Antony C/O Tektronix U.K. Ltd Endeavour House, Chivers Way Histon, Cambridge, CB24 9ZR / GB | [2012/01] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
Norman, Martin Alan C/O Tektronix U.K. Ltd Endeavour House, Chivers Way Histon, Cambridge, CB24 9ZR / GB | ||
02 /
Robinson, Paul Antony C/O Tektronix U.K. Ltd Endeavour House, Chivers Way Histon, Cambridge, CB24 9ZR / GB | Representative(s) | Clarke, Jeffrey David HGF Limited 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Clarke, Jeffrey Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London, Greater London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2011/20] | Clarke, Jeffrey Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London, Greater London WC2A 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09174903.6 | 03.11.2009 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2323392 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2323392 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N17/04, H04N17/00, H04N7/52 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
H04N17/004 (EP,US);
H04N21/234318 (EP,US);
H04N21/242 (EP,US);
H04N21/4302 (EP,US);
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04N21/44209 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen der Verzögerung innerhalb eines komprimierten digitalen Stroms | [2011/20] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring delay within a compressed digital stream | [2011/20] | French: | Procédé et appareil de mesure de délai dans un flux numérique compressé | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 04.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2009 | AT | 04.01.2012 | BE | 04.01.2012 | CY | 04.01.2012 | CZ | 04.01.2012 | DK | 04.01.2012 | EE | 04.01.2012 | FI | 04.01.2012 | HR | 04.01.2012 | LT | 04.01.2012 | LV | 04.01.2012 | MK | 04.01.2012 | MT | 04.01.2012 | NL | 04.01.2012 | PL | 04.01.2012 | RO | 04.01.2012 | SE | 04.01.2012 | SI | 04.01.2012 | SK | 04.01.2012 | SM | 04.01.2012 | TR | 04.01.2012 | BG | 04.04.2012 | NO | 04.04.2012 | GR | 05.04.2012 | ES | 15.04.2012 | IS | 04.05.2012 | PT | 04.05.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 03.11.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2012 | ||
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
SM | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
SM | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 04.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0648056 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 7, line 19 - line 26 * * column 7, line 58; figure 4 *; | [A]US2003198256 (WANG CHARLES CHUANMING [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]WO2004099801 (TUT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2006098742 (MEENAKSHISUNDARAM RAMANATHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A] - WAGNER M ET AL, "Analysis and Improvements of Zapping Times in IPTV Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090601), vol. 55, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9316, pages 407 - 418, XP011252789 [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [T] - LU G J ET AL, "MECHANISMS OF MPEG STREAM SYNCHRONIZATION", COMPUTER COMMUNICATION REVIEW, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19940101), vol. 24, no. 1, ISSN 0146-4833, pages 57 - 67, XP000560498 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/196997.197008 |