EP2184382 - Hydrogen-oxygen mixed gas generating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hwang, Boo-Sung 402 New Sun-kyung Plaza 146-1, Imae 2 dong, Bun-dang gu Seong-nam si Kyung-ki do / KR | [2010/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/19] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | Lang, Christian, et al LangRaible GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Herzog-Wilhelm-Straße 22 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09174965.5 | 03.11.2009 | [2010/19] | Priority number, date | KR20080110362 | 07.11.2008 Original published format: KR 20080110362 | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2184382 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/04, C25B15/00 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
C25B1/04 (EP,KR,US);
C25B1/02 (KR);
C25B15/00 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wasserstoff-Sauerstoff-Mischgaserzeugungssystem | [2010/19] | English: | Hydrogen-oxygen mixed gas generating system | [2010/19] | French: | Système de génération de gaz mixte à hydrogène-oxygène | [2010/19] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/07] | 26.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 28.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 28.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN2327698Y (DONG RUOXI [CN]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *; | [Y]US6446942 (TSAI MING-KUN [TW]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * |