EP2184138 - Multi-speed power tool transmission with alternative ring gear configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2010/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomayko, David C. / 2922 Greenway Drive Ellicott City, MD 21042 / US | 02 /
Zhang, Qiang / 2116 Starmount Lane Lutherville, MD 21093 / US | 03 /
Poetzl, Mark R. / 311 Cree Terrace Rising Sun, MD 21911 / US | 04 /
Debellius, Stephen A. / 9 Glenroy Court New Freedom, PA 17349 / US | [2013/04] |
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
Tomayko, David C. 2922 Greenway Drive Ellicott City, MD 21042 / US | ||
02 /
Zhang, Qiang 2116 Starmount Lane Lutherville, MD 21093 / US | |||
03 /
Poetzl, Mark R. 311 Cree Terrace Rising Sun, MD 21911 / US | |||
04 /
Debellius, Stephen A. 9 Glenroy Court New Freedom, PA 17349 / US | Representative(s) | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [2013/04] |
Former [2010/19] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09175302.0 | 06.11.2009 | [2010/19] | Priority number, date | US20080112741P | 08.11.2008 Original published format: US 112741 P | US20090610762 | 02.11.2009 Original published format: US 610762 | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2184138 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2184138 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2184138 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00, B23B45/00 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
B25F5/001 (EP,US);
B23B45/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/19] | Title | German: | Mehrgängiges Elektrowerkzeuggetriebe mit Alternativzahnradkonfiguration | [2010/19] | English: | Multi-speed power tool transmission with alternative ring gear configuration | [2010/19] | French: | Transmission d'outil électrique à vitesses multiples dotée d'une configuration d'engrenage de couronne alternative | [2010/19] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 25.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 13.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 13.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2009 | AT | 23.01.2013 | BE | 23.01.2013 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | HR | 23.01.2013 | IT | 23.01.2013 | LT | 23.01.2013 | LV | 23.01.2013 | MC | 23.01.2013 | MK | 23.01.2013 | MT | 23.01.2013 | NL | 23.01.2013 | PL | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SE | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | SM | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | NO | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | ES | 04.05.2013 | IS | 23.05.2013 | PT | 23.05.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 06.11.2009 | |
AT | 23.01.2013 | ||
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
NO | 23.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1445074 (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4,7,8,10-13,15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027]; figure - *; | [A]GB2383387 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-3,7,9,10 * page 4, line 24 - page 7, line 5; figure - *; | [A]GB2396390 (MOBILETRON ELECTRONICS CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0016] - [0019]; figure - * | by applicant | US6431289 | US7314097 | EP1443074 | US5704433 | USRE37905E |