EP2199497 - Wind turbine tower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senvion GmbH Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | [2015/36] |
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Senvion SE Überseering 10 (Oval Office) 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states REpower Systems SE Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states REpower Systems AG Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meesenburg, Uwe Hans-Holtorf-Straße 8 25840 Friedrichstadt / DE | [2017/33] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
Meesenburg, Uwe Hans-Holtorf-Straße 8 25840, Friedrichstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Seemann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | Grebner, Christian Georg Rudolf Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09175780.7 | 12.11.2009 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | DE20081063846 | 19.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008063846 | DE20091013186 | 17.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009013186 | [2010/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2199497 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2199497 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2199497 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04H12/08, E04H12/34 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
E04H12/08 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49631 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] |
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Turm einer Windenergieanlage | [2010/25] | English: | Wind turbine tower | [2010/25] | French: | Tour d'une éolienne | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2009 | CY | 16.08.2017 | CZ | 16.08.2017 | EE | 16.08.2017 | FI | 16.08.2017 | HR | 16.08.2017 | IT | 16.08.2017 | LT | 16.08.2017 | LV | 16.08.2017 | MC | 16.08.2017 | MK | 16.08.2017 | MT | 16.08.2017 | NL | 16.08.2017 | PL | 16.08.2017 | PT | 16.08.2017 | RO | 16.08.2017 | SE | 16.08.2017 | SI | 16.08.2017 | SK | 16.08.2017 | SM | 16.08.2017 | TR | 16.08.2017 | AT | 12.11.2017 | IE | 12.11.2017 | LU | 12.11.2017 | BG | 16.11.2017 | NO | 16.11.2017 | GR | 17.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | IS | 16.12.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 12.11.2009 | |
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
MT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
AT | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 12.11.2009 | |
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
MT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
AT | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 12.11.2009 | |
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
MT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
AT | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.11.2009 | |
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
AT | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.11.2009 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
AT | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
AT | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 16.08.2017 | |
NO | 16.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006225379 (SEIDEL MARC [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,13-15 * figures 1-5 * [Y] 3-12; | [YD]EP1775419 (ZARGES ALUMINIUM SYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [YD] 3 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE19609006 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [Y] 4,11,12 * figure 4 *; | [Y]US3618702 (HENDRIX HAROLD JR, et al) [Y] 5-10 * figure 1 * | Examination | WO2007095940 | WO03036084 | DE19741988 | DE3926488 | by applicant | WO2004083633 | WO03036084 | EP1775419 |