Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8460599 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2013 | B2 | US2010090375 | 15.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008061492 | 10.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2196300 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2017 | B1 | EP2196300 | 14.03.2012 | A3 | EP2196300 | 16.06.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102008061492 | 10.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101746051B | 09.04.2014 | B | CN101746051 | 23.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102008061492 | 10.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008061492 | 17.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008061492 | 10.12.2008 |