EP2208594 - Method for manufacturing a fire retardant wooden work surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. OG Tiroler Strasse 16 3105 Unterradlberg / AT | [2010/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, Martin Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. Mittendorferweg 31 6380, St. Johann in Tirol / AT | [2014/21] |
Former [2010/29] | 01 /
Berger, Martin Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. Mittendorferweg 31 6380, St. Johann in Tirol / AT | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2010/29] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09176759.0 | 23.11.2009 | [2010/29] | Priority number, date | DE20091005155 | 15.01.2009 Original published format: DE102009005155 | [2010/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2208594 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2208594 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B27N9/00, E04B1/94 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
B27N9/00 (EP);
E04B1/942 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer brandhemmenden Holzwerkstoffplatte | [2010/29] | English: | Method for manufacturing a fire retardant wooden work surface | [2010/29] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une plaque en matériau dérivé du bois inhibant les incendies | [2010/29] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2009 | BG | 21.05.2014 | CY | 21.05.2014 | CZ | 21.05.2014 | DK | 21.05.2014 | EE | 21.05.2014 | FI | 21.05.2014 | HR | 21.05.2014 | LT | 21.05.2014 | LV | 21.05.2014 | MC | 21.05.2014 | MK | 21.05.2014 | MT | 21.05.2014 | SI | 21.05.2014 | SK | 21.05.2014 | SM | 21.05.2014 | NO | 21.08.2014 | GR | 22.08.2014 | IS | 21.09.2014 | PT | 22.09.2014 | IE | 23.11.2014 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 23.11.2009 | |
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MK | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
TR | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 23.11.2009 | |
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MK | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.11.2009 | |
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.11.2009 | |
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 21.05.2014 | |
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | DK | 21.05.2014 | |
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 21.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2006015677 (ACHILLES CORP) [I] 1-4,7-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [ 0022] , [0024] , [ 0025] * [Y] 5-6; | [Y]DE102005049788 (KARL ZIMMERMANN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5-6 * abstract *; | [A]US2005053778 (HUKKANEN JARMO [FI]) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2008196344 (CHANG TSAO [TW], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US3574644 (OLSTOWSKI FRANCISZEK, et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]DE2717057 (MOELLER KAJ SKOTTE) [A] 1-15 | by applicant | EP0694372 | DE102004017578 | DE102005049788 |