EP2193993 - Vertical take off and landing unmanned aerial vehicle airframe structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goossen, Emray Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101Columbia Road P.O.Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07692-2245 / US | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09176972.9 | 24.11.2009 | [2010/23] | Priority number, date | US20080120681P | 08.12.2008 Original published format: US 120681 P | US20090506052 | 20.07.2009 Original published format: US 506052 | [2010/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2193993 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2193993 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/20, B64C39/02 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
B64U10/13 (EP,US);
B64U10/20 (EP,US);
B64U30/26 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
B64U60/50 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49336 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Struktur eines senkrecht startendes und landendes unbemanntes Luftfahrzeugs | [2010/23] | English: | Vertical take off and landing unmanned aerial vehicle airframe structure | [2010/23] | French: | Structure de cellule aéronautique de véhicule aérien sans pilote à décollage et atterrissage verticaux | [2010/23] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 11.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0661206 (HUGHES MISSILE SYSTEMS [US]); | [X]WO0160692 (BERTIN TECHNOLOGIES SA [FR], et al); | [X]US2002100834 (BALDWIN G DOUGLAS [US]); | [YA]US2006091258 (CHIU TIEN S [US], et al); | [YA]US2006192047 (GOOSSEN EMRAY R [US]) | by applicant | US2006091258 |