EP2159987 - Session initiation protocol (SIP) based user initiated handoff [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Technology Corporation 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2013/15] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shaheen, Kamel, M. 429 Ashton Drive King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2018/01] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
Shaheen, Kamel, M. 429 Ashton Drive King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2011/28] | Badel, Xavier Claude Yves, et al AWAPATENT AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/09] | Nordin, Magnus Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09177108.9 | 30.11.2004 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | US20030526135 | 01.12.2003 Original published format: US 526135 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2159987 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2159987 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/58, H04L29/12, H04W8/04, H04W36/14, H04W36/36, H04L12/741, H04L29/06, H04W36/00, // H04W28/18, H04W76/02, H04W80/10, H04W84/12 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
H04W36/36 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L65/1101 (BR,US);
H04L41/026 (US);
H04L41/0681 (US);
H04L45/745 (EP,US);
H04L51/10 (US);
H04L63/0892 (US);
H04L65/1083 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,BR,US);
H04L65/65 (US);
H04W36/1446 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04W80/10 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L2101/37 (EP,US);
H04L2101/65 (US);
H04W28/18 (EP,BR,US);
H04W36/0019 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W4/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/09] | H04L29/06, H04W36/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/01] |
Former [2010/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SIP (Session Initiation Protocol) basierte benutzerinitiierte Weiterreichung | [2017/30] | English: | Session initiation protocol (SIP) based user initiated handoff | [2010/09] | French: | Transfert initié par l'utilisateur et basé sur le protocole d'initiation de session (SIP) | [2010/09] |
Former [2010/09] | Auf SIP (Session Initiation Protocol) basierte benutzerinitiierte Weiterreichung | Examination procedure | 25.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 02.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04812536.3 / EP1697851 | Divisional application(s) | EP17200157.0 / EP3328021 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040812536) is 16.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2004 | AT | 03.01.2018 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | DK | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | ES | 03.01.2018 | FI | 03.01.2018 | IT | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | PL | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | SE | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | TR | 03.01.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 |