EP2194388 - Winding diagnostic system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seeley, Charles Erklin 11 Ashford Lane Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
Younsi, Karim 23 Sierra Trace Ballston Lake, NY 12019-1022 / US | 03 /
Salem, Sameh R. 18 Appleton Road Rexford, NY 12148 / US | 04 /
Hershey, John Erik 4 Vines Road Ballston Lake, NY 12019 / US | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2010/23] | Gray, Thomas, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09177145.1 | 26.11.2009 | [2010/23] | Priority number, date | US20080328840 | 05.12.2008 Original published format: US 328840 | [2010/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2194388 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2194388 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02, G01R31/06, G01R31/12, G01R31/34 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
G01R31/346 (EP,US);
G01R31/34 (KR);
G01R31/50 (EP,US);
G01R31/52 (EP,US);
G01R31/1227 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/23] | G01R31/02, G01R31/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wicklungsdiagnosesystem und -verfahren | [2010/23] | English: | Winding diagnostic system and method | [2010/23] | French: | Système et procédé de diagnostic d'enroulement | [2010/23] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 09.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2004135588 (BISSONNETTE MARC [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0031]; figure 2 *[A] 11; | [XA]US2005284241 (SWARTOUT RICHARD N [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0030]; figures 2,3,4,5 * [A] 11; | [XA]US2007296309 (YOUNSI KARIM ABDELKRIM [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0030]; figure 11 * [A] 11 |