EP2327646 - Switch in a branch of a transport path for laboratory samples in an analytical laboratory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLP systems GmbH Grossmoorbogen 25 21079 Hamburg / DE | [2011/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Froreich, André, Dr. Forsthöhe 33 21149 Hamburg / DE | [2011/22] | Representative(s) | von Eichel-Streiber, Caspar, et al Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2011/22] | Application number, filing date | 09177226.9 | 26.11.2009 | [2011/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2327646 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2327646 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/84, G01N35/04 | [2011/22] | CPC: |
B65G47/848 (EP);
G01N35/04 (EP);
B65G2201/0261 (EP);
G01N2035/0406 (EP);
G01N2035/0477 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/22] | Title | German: | In einem Abzweig einer Transportbahn für Laborproben in einem analytischen Labor angeordnete Weiche | [2011/22] | English: | Switch in a branch of a transport path for laboratory samples in an analytical laboratory | [2011/22] | French: | Aiguillage agencé dans un détournement d'une bande de transport pour échantillons de laboratoire dans un laboratoire d'analyse | [2011/22] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 26.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2009 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | HR | 08.02.2012 | IE | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | MK | 08.02.2012 | MT | 08.02.2012 | PL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | SM | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | NO | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 26.11.2009 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
SM | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
SM | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 08.02.2012 | |
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 08.02.2012 | |
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0775650 (VON FROREICH ANDRE DR [DE]) [A] 1,3 * figure 1; claims 1,5,6,8 *; | [A]US5730276 (ITOH TERUAKI [JP]) [A] 6-8* column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 53; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2005207937 (ITOH TERUAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0074]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE4329078 | DE4434714 | US2005207937 |