blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2327790

EP2327790 - New 7ß-hydroxy steroid dehydrogenases and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  23.12.2011
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 25.01.2012  [2012/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PharmaZell GmbH
Rosenheimer Str. 43
83064 Raubling / DE
[2011/22]
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstraße 4
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/22]Reitstötter - Kinzebach
Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date09177544.530.11.2009
[2011/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2327790
Date:01.06.2011
Language:DE
[2011/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2010
ClassificationIPC:C12P33/06, C12N9/02
[2011/22]
CPC:
C12P33/06 (EP); C12N9/0006 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/22]
TitleGerman:Neuartige 7ß-Hydroxysteroid Dehydrogenasen und deren Verwendung[2011/22]
English:New 7ß-hydroxy steroid dehydrogenases and their use[2011/22]
French:7ß-hydroxystéroïdes déshydrogénases d'un nouveau type et leur utilisation[2011/22]
Examination procedure01.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2012/04]
11.09.2011Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/04]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO2009118176  (PHARMAZELL GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 13-16 * the whole document *;
 [XYI]  - Sudarsanam P. et al., "SubName: Full=Putative uncharacterized protein", UniProt, (20070417), Database accession no. A4ECA9, XP002579158 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 13-16 [I] 4-12
 [XYI]  - HIRANO S ET AL, Characterization of NADP-dependent 7 beta-hydroxysteroid dehydrogenases from Peptostreptococcus productus and Eubacterium aerofaciens., APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY MAY 1982 LNKD- PUBMED:6954878, VOL. 43, NR. 5, PAGE(S) 1057 - 1063, (198205), ISSN 0099-2240, XP002579159 [X] 1-3,7,9 * the whole document * [Y] 13-16 [I] 4-6,8,10-12
 [Y]  - CARREA GIACOMO ET AL, Enzymatic synthesis of 12-ketoursodeoxycholic acid from dehydrocholic acid in a membrane reactor, BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, VOL. 14, NR. 12, PAGE(S) 1131-1134, (1992), ISSN 0141-5492, XP002579160 [Y] 13-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BOVARA ROBERTO ET AL, A new enzymatic route to the synthesis of 12-ketoursodeoxycholic acid, BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, VOL. 18, NR. 3, PAGE(S) 305-308, (1996), ISSN 0141-5492, XP002579162 [A] 13-16 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1149849
 EP1069183
 DE10019377
    - ZHU, D. ET AL., "Enzymatic enantioselective reduction of -ketoesters by a thermostable 7 -hydroxysteroid dehydrogenase from Bacteroides fragilis", TETRAHEDRON, (2006), vol. 62, no. 18, pages 4535 - 4539
    - "Clostridium absonum", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1981), vol. 665, no. 2, pages 262 - 9
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD, SCI., (1988), vol. 85, no. 8, pages 2444 - 2448
    - NARANG, S.A., TETRAHEDRON, (1983), vol. 39, page 3
    - ITAKURA ET AL., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 53, page 323
    - ITAKURA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 198, page 1056
    - IKE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1983), vol. 11, page 477
    - ARKIN; YOURVAN, PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 7811 - 7815
    - DELGRAVE ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1993), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 327 - 331
    - HIGGINS DG; SHARP PM, "Fast and sensitive multiple sequence alignments on a microcomputer", COMPUT APPL. BIOSCI., (198904), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 151 - 1
    - CHENNA ET AL., "Multiple sequence alignment with the Clustal series of programs", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2003), vol. 31, no. 13, pages 3497 - 500
    - BEKANNTER WEISE, Phosphoamiditmethode, WILEY PRESS, pages 896 - 897
    - SAMBROOK, J.; FRITSCH, E.F.; MANIATIS, T., Molecular Cloning (A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), pages 9.31 - 9.57
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1989), pages 6.3.1 - 6.3.6
    - KEGLER-EBO DM; DOCKTOR CM; DIMAIO D, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1994), vol. 22, page 1593
    - BARETTINO D ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1994), vol. 22, page 541
    - BARIK S, MOL BIOTECHNOL, (1995), vol. 3, page 1
    - ECKERT KA; KUNKEL TA, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1990), vol. 18, page 3739
    - STEMMER WPC, NATURE, (1994), vol. 370, page 389
    - STEMMER WPC, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1994), vol. 91, page 10747
    - REETZ MT; JAEGER K-E, TOPICS CURR CHEM, (1999), vol. 200, page 31
    - "Gene Expression Technology", GOEDDEL, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), page 185
    - Applied Microbiol. Physiology, A Practical Approach, IRL PRESS, (1997), pages 53 - 73
    - K. DRAUZ; H. WALDMANN, Enzyme Catalysis in Organic Synthesis, WILEY-VCH, (2002), vol. LLL, pages 991 - 1032
    - HIRANO, S.; N. MASUDA, "Characterization of NADP-dependent 7 beta-hydroxysteroid dehydrogenases from Peptostreptococcus productus and Eubacterium aerofaciens", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (1982), vol. 43, no. 5, pages 1057 - 63
    - "A novel member of the short-chain dehydrogenaselreductase superfamily", J BIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, no. 47, pages 30888 - 96
 WO2009EP02190
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.