EP2198906 - Injection method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWEN MUMFORD LIMITED Brook Hill Oxford, Oxfordshire OX20 ITU / GB | [2016/01] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states OWEN MUMFORD LIMITED Brook Hill Oxford, Oxfordshire OX20 1TU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marshall, Jeremy 16 Cranham Street Jericho Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 6DD / GB | 02 /
Eaton, Mark 113 Hailey Road Witney Oxford, Oxfordshire OX28 1HL / GB | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | ||
Former [2010/25] | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09178013.0 | 28.11.2006 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | GB20050024604 | 02.12.2005 Original published format: GB 0524604 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2198906 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2198906 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2198906 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M5/20 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
A61M5/31583 (EP,US);
A61M5/20 (EP,US);
A61M5/3155 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6081 (EP,US);
A61M5/31535 (EP,US);
A61M5/31543 (EP,US);
A61M5/31553 (EP,US);
A61M5/3156 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | A61M5/315 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, PL [2016/01] |
Former [2010/25] | DE, DK, FR, GB, PL | Title | German: | Injektionsverfahren und -vorrichtung | [2010/25] | English: | Injection method and apparatus | [2010/25] | French: | Procédé d'injection et appareil | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 05.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06808780.8 / EP1954337 | Divisional application(s) | EP15202981.5 / EP3020433 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060808780) is 17.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | [2016/46] |
Former [2016/36] | PL | 06.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9422507 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1,4 * page 26, line 1 - line 7 * * figure 48 *; | [A]US5584815 (PAWELKA GERHARD E F [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 6, line 51 - line 58 * * figure 6 *; | [A]DE19838760 (BAUER JLONA [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 1 * * figure 2 *; | [X]WO0224260 (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [X] 4,5 * page 12, line 15 - line 25 * * page 14, line 11 - page 15, line 4 * * figures 4-6 *; | [A]WO2004078241 (DCA DESIGN INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 1 - line 8 ** figures 9,10 *; | [A]DE20317377U (B D MEDICO S A R L [CH]) [A] 1,4 * paragraphs [0065] , [0084] - [0086]; figures 9,10,23,25,29,30 * | Examination | EP1804865 |